Sinkovich et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Sinkovich and Aaron Sinkovich
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson and Ethicon Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00265
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
2 Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Docket Annotation: Case 3:19-CV-1372 will be the lead case and all further docketing shall be done in the lead case ONLY. (jdp )
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 TEXT ORDER: deeming this case related to Balura et al. v. Ethicon Inc., et al., Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-1372 (LEK/ML) under Section G.2. of General Order 12, because there exists a similarity of facts and legal issues between the two cases that will likely result in a substantial saving of judicial resources. Additionally, actions involving common questions of law or fact pending before a court may be consolidated to avoid unnecessary costs or delay pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P., Rule 42(a). As a result, the Court finds that consolidation is appropriate; Civil Action No. 3:19-CV-1372 (LEK/ML) shall be deemed the "Lead Case" and this case shall be deemed a "Member Case." ALL FUTURE FILINGS MUST BE FILED IN THE LEAD ACTION ONLY, 3:19-cv-1372 (LEK/ML). NO FURTHER SUBMISSIONS ARE TO BE FILED IN THIS ACTION. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/23/2020.(jdp )
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 initial conference currently scheduled for 4/15/2020, is adjourned without date. The Court will issue a re-scheduling order in the near future. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/14/2020.(jdp )
April 8, 2020 Filing 80 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN Joint Rule 26(F) Report and Scheduling Order by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Gerstel, Diana)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/31/2020. (jdp, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #70 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/30/2020. (jdp, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 77 Supplemental Admission documents re: #71 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Balefsky, Lee)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #69 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/30/2020. (jdp, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by John K. Powers on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Powers, John)
March 27, 2020 Filing 74 Supplemental Admission documents re: #71 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Jordan, Laura)
March 27, 2020 Filing 73 Supplemental Admission documents re: #70 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Jordan, Laura)
March 27, 2020 Filing 72 Supplemental Admission documents re: #69 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Jordan, Laura)
March 26, 2020 Notice of Filing Deficiency re: #71 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lee B. Balefsky. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: new Petition for Admission to Practice in the form published by the Court on 12/2019, signed and dated Attorney Registration Form; The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lee B. Balefsky Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5071126. filed by Aaron Sinkovich, Brenda Sinkovich. (Jordan, Laura)
March 25, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher A. Gomez Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5071122. filed by Aaron Sinkovich, Brenda Sinkovich. (Jordan, Laura)
March 25, 2020 Filing 69 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aaron L. Dunbar Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5071120. filed by Aaron Sinkovich, Brenda Sinkovich. (Jordan, Laura)
March 25, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura M. Jordan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Jordan, Laura)
March 20, 2020 Filing 67 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gerstel, Diana)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' joint letter request #65 is GRANTED. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/18/2020. (jdp )
March 17, 2020 Filing 65 Letter Request Letter Motion from Defendants for Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson requesting Joint Request to be Relieved of the Obligation to Exchange Rule 26 Disclosures submitted to Judge Lovric . (Gerstel, Diana)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn for all further proceedings.. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/17/2020. (khr)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT NOTICE: The Rule 16 in-person initial conference scheduled for 4/15/2020 at 2:30 p.m., has changed in that it will now be conducted via telephone conference. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to initiate the conference call. Once all participants are on the line, place the call to chambers at 607-779-2628. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/17/2020.(jdp )
March 12, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Maha M. Kabbash on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Kabbash, Maha)
March 12, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly S. Crawford on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Crawford, Kelly)
March 12, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE by Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Withdrawal of Counsel (Gerstel, Diana)
March 12, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Katz Gerstel on behalf of Ethicon Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Gerstel, Diana)
March 10, 2020 Filing 59 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial In-Person Rule 16 Conference set for 4/15/2020 at 2:30 PM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/8/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) {Attorneys' served electronically} (jmb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendants'; Attorney Susan M. Robinson, Esq. and David B. Thomas, Esq., Email address is srobinson@tcspllc.com and dthomas@tcspllc.com. Phone number is 304-414-1800. Admissions due by 3/24/2020. {Attorneys' served electronically} (jmb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendants'; Attorney John J. ODonnell, Esq., Joseph E. ONeil, Esq., and Julia M. Rafferty, Esq., Email address is jodonnell@campbelltriallawyers.com, joneil@campbelltriallawyers.com, and jrafferty@campbelltriallawyers.com. Phone number is 610-964-1900 and 610-727-5026. Admissions due by 3/24/2020. {Attorneys' served electronically} (jmb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Defendants'; Attorney William M. Gage, Esq., Kari L. Sutherland, Esq., and Christy D. Jones, Esq., Email address is william.gage@butlersnow.com, kari.sutherland@butlersnow.com and christy.jones@butlersnow.com. Phone number is 601-985-4500 and 901-680-7354. Admissions due by 3/24/2020. {Attorneys' served electronically} (jmb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT: as to Party Plaintiffs'; Attorney Lee B. Balefsky, Esq., and Michelle L. Tiger, Esq., Email addresses are: Lee.Balefsky@Klinespecter.com and mtiger@youmancaputo.com. Phone number is 215-772-1000. Admissions due by 3/24/2020. {Attorneys' served electronically} (jmb)
March 10, 2020 Filing 54 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-01062. electronically transferred when case opened
February 28, 2020 Filing 53 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #45 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1986) Pls Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1988) Pls Mem in Support of Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2143) Defs Resp to Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3844) Pls Reply to Notice of Adoption of Prior Response of Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6864) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6973) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr., #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7119) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas C. Wright, Jr.)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 52 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #45 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6860) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6965) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7143) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 51 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #45 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (6857) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (6972) Notice of Adoption of dResponse to Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (7113) Notice of Adoption of Reply in Support of Pls Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 50 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #45 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2050) Pls Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2051) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2159) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2230) Pls Reply to Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6798) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7019) Notice of Adoption of Response to Pls Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7440) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Pls Mot to Exclude Nicole Fleischmann)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 49 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #45 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14 - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (5482) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (6852) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (6960) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 48 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #45 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2759) - Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2760) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2949) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3017) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6821) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6958) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7177) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Defs Mot to Exclude Peggy Pence)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 47 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #45 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3626) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6648) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6833) Amended Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6926) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7123) Notice of Adoption of Reply to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 46 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #45 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3619) Part 1- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2- Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3621) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 3 - Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6875) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7038) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7045) Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (7085) Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7183) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 45 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 3/2/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A It is DIRECTED that on 03/06/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 03/05/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 02/21/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mms) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
April 24, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exh 1-List of Cases, #2 Exh 2- Letter)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Aaron Sinkovich, Brenda Sinkovich (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mwk) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF REQUEST TO BE REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S SERVICE LIST by Alexander Daniel MacMullan on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (MacMullan, Alexander) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Withdrawal by Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson (MacMullan, Alexander) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
January 25, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Julia M. Rafferty on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rafferty, Julia) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Alexander Daniel MacMullan updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (MacMullan, Alexander) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by John J. O'Donnell updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (O'Donnell, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Joseph E. O'Neil updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (O'Neil, Joseph) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF REQUEST TO BE REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S SERVICE LIST by Julianne E. Jayson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jayson, Julianne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Julianne E. Jayson for Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Jayson, Julianne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
October 25, 2018 Filing 30 OPPOSITION by Aaron Sinkovich and Brenda Sinkovich to #28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balefsky, Lee) (Modified text on 10/26/2018) (slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Jayson, Julianne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
October 16, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Jayson, Julianne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
October 3, 2018 Filing 27 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FRIENDS AND FAMILY MEMBERS by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Brenda Sinkovich, Aaron Sinkovich (Jayson, Julianne) (Modified on 10/4/2018 to add party filers)(rmc). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 25 THIRD AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Melinda Rupp, M.D. on 7/18/18 at 2:00 p.m. (O'Donnell, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
June 28, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by John J. O'Donnell on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (O'Donnell, John) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 23 SECOND AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Melinda Rupp, M.D. on 7/18/18 at 2:00 p.m. (Jayson, Julianne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 21 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Melanie Rupp, M.D. on 7/18/18 at 2:00 p.m. (Jayson, Julianne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aaron Sinkovich, Brenda Sinkovich for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case-Specific Expert Witnesses. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 19 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (O'Neil, Joseph) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (O'Neil, Joseph) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
May 10, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Melinda Rupp, M.D. on June 8, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. (MacMullan, Alexander) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Brenda Sinkovich on 5/29/2018 at 2:00 p.m. (MacMullan, Alexander) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
April 26, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Brenda Sinkovich on 5/29/2018 at 2:00 p.m. (MacMullan, Alexander) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Alexander Daniel MacMullan on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (MacMullan, Alexander) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Julianne E. Jayson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jayson, Julianne) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
April 17, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Joseph E. O'Neil on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (O'Neil, Joseph) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (kab) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Melanie Rupp on 5/23/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Jones, Alyson) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
October 4, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
June 2, 2017 Filing 8 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Aaron Sinkovich, Brenda Sinkovich. (Balefsky, Lee) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Withdraw #5 Motion for Sanctions for Failure to Timely Serve Plaintiff Profile Form; and denying as moot #5 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Sanctions for Failure to Timely Serve Plaintiff Profile Form. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/6/2015. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
May 5, 2015 Filing 6 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Withdraw #5 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Sanctions for Failure to Timely Serve Plaintiff Profile Form (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
April 30, 2015 Filing 5 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Sanctions for Failure to Timely Serve Plaintiff Profile Form (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
March 30, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
March 17, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
January 27, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 163 (Order Rescheduling Meetings in MDLs from January 29-30, 2015 to February 5-6, 2015) entered on 01/26/2015 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]
January 26, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3654118. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tlg) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 3/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sinkovich et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Sinkovich
Represented By: Laura M. Jordan
Represented By: John K. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Sinkovich
Represented By: Laura M. Jordan
Represented By: John K. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc.
Represented By: Maha M. Kabbash
Represented By: Kelly S. Crawford
Represented By: Diana Katz Gerstel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?