Haynie v. Cornell University
Plaintiff: Olivia Haynie
Defendant: Cornell University
Case Number: 3:2020cv00467
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 initial conference currently scheduled for 7/29/2020, is adjourned and re-scheduled for 9/2/2020 at 10:00 a.m., at the U.S. Courthouse, 15 Henry Street, Binghamton, New York before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. On or before 8/26/2020, the Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/11/2020.(jdp)
June 9, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Notice regarding related cases filed by Olivia Haynie: It is hereby ORDERED that, for the purpose of judicial economy, this case is deemed related to 3:20-cv-471 MAD/ML and 3:20-cv-592 MAD/ML. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 6/9/20. (ban)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/9/2020. (jdp, )
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/9/2020. (jdp, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lauren Hartz Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5135334. filed by Cornell University. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission ProHacVice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Registration Form, #4 Declaration of Sponsor, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Dorn, Valerie)
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ishan Bhabha Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5135279. filed by Cornell University. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission ProHacVice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Registration Form, #4 Declaration of Sponsor, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Dorn, Valerie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie L. Dorn on behalf of Cornell University (Dorn, Valerie)
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Pence on behalf of Cornell University (Pence, Adam)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Olivia Haynie of Related Action (Roberts, Max)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Olivia Haynie. Cornell University waiver sent on 5/6/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Roberts, Max)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Max Stuart Roberts on behalf of Olivia Haynie (Roberts, Max)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (see)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Olivia Haynie. Attorneys Max S. Roberts, Esq. and Sarah N. Westcot, Esq. admissions due by 5/8/2020. (dpk)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cornell University. (dpk)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 7/29/2020 at 10:00 AM in Binghamton before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Judge Lovric only holds Rule 16 Initial Conferences IN PERSON in Binghamton, New York in all cases with no exceptions. Requests to appear by telephone conference at the Rule 16 Initial Conference will be DENIED. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 7/22/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cornell University (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5100647) filed by Olivia Haynie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynie v. Cornell University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell University
Represented By: Valerie L. Dorn
Represented By: Adam Pence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Haynie
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Represented By: Max Stuart Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?