Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rodney L. Smith
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2020cv00810
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 PRO SE NOTICE: returned signed/executed by Plaintiff Rodney L. Smith. (jmb)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Rodney L. Smith, Pro Se advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (jmb)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Commissioner of Social Security re 10 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Commissioner (Tucker, Jessica)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jessica Tucker appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 10/21/2020. (Tucker, Jessica)
July 22, 2020 Filing 9 DECISION & ORDER: It is Ordered that the #4 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 7/22/2020. {Copy served upon the pro se plaintiff via regular mail} (jmb)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The court will consider plaintiff's #4 motion for appointment of counsel in a separate order. Plaintiff is reminded that the Social Security Consent/Declination Form is due by 8/7/2020. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 7/21/2020. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 PRO SE HANDBOOK, Pro Se Notice, Local Rules, Lawyer Referral Guide and Pro Se Assistance Program Pamphlet sent to Rodney L. Smith, Pro Se via regular mail. (pjh, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 8/7/2020. {Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail} (pjh, ) Modified on 7/20/2020 to reflect that pro se plaintiff was served. (pjh, ). (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/24/2020) (pjh, ).
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Rodney L. Smith, Pro Se. Both Consent and Declination oxes checked. {Clerk notes that a new form was mailed to the Pro Se}(pjh, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Rodney L. Smith, Pro Se. (pjh, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Rodney L. Smith, Pro Se. (pjh, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court and will be removed from the docket upon the filing of the Administrative Transcript. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (pjh, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jessica Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?