Arnone v. Saul
Plaintiff: Anthony Arnone
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00943
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Anthony Arnone advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (Gorton, Peter)
September 1, 2020 Payment of Civil Filing Fee $400, receipt number ANYNDC-5225998 by Anthony Arnone . (Gorton, Peter)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER DENYING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis of Anthony Arnone: Based upon the Court's review of the motion, it appears Plaintiff does have sufficient resources to pay the Court's filing fee. WHEREFORE, it is hereby ORDERED, that the Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt. No. 3) is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED, that on or before 10/1/2020 Plaintiff shall pay the $400 filing fee; and it is further ORDERED, that Plaintiff's failure to comply with the terms of this Order may result in the administrative closure of this case for failure to pay the filing fee. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/1/2020. (sg )
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Luis Pere appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 11/23/2020. (Pere, Luis)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 9/8/2020. (map)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anthony Arnone. (map)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court and will be removed from the docket upon the filing of the Administrative Transcript. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (map)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Assignment of Attorney's Fees)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnone v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Luis Pere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Arnone
Represented By: Peter A. Gorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?