Myrick v. Saul
Plaintiff: Micheal Ben Myrick
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv00946
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed status report (Dkt. No. #9 ) and notes the spelling of plaintiff's first name is correct on the docket caption. Further submissions by the parties shall use the spelling as indicated in the caption on the docket. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/9/2020. (sg)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STATUS REPORT by Micheal Ben Myrick. (Krupar, Elizabeth)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed the docket and notes two different spellings of the Plaintiff's first name ("Micheal" and "Michael"). Plaintiff to file a status report to the Court by 9/11/2020 with respect to the correct spelling of Plaintiff's first name. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/2/2020. (sg)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis of Michael Ben Myrick: The Court having considered Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees under 28 U.S.C. 1915 (Dkt. No. #3 ), it is hereby ORDERED, that the application is GRANTED. **Plaintiff should note that, although the application to proceed in forma pauperis has been granted, Plaintiff will still be required to pay fees that Plaintiff incurs in this action, including copying and/or witness fees. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/31/2020. (sg )
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Christopher Lewis Potter appearing for Commissioner of Social Security . Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 11/23/2020. (Potter, Christopher)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT / DECLINATION FORM filed by Micheal Ben Myrick advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (jel, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the Plaintiff does not timely consent, or if the United States timely withdraws its consent, the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12. Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 9/8/2020. (jel, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Micheal Ben Myrick. (jel, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court and will be removed from the docket upon the filing of the Administrative Transcript. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (jel, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Notice of Unfavorable Decision, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myrick v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Christopher Lewis Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Micheal Ben Myrick
Represented By: Elizabeth V. Krupar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?