The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development v. Gilbert et al
Plaintiff: The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Defendant: Jane Doe #1-5, Jean L. Gilbert and John Doe #1-5
Case Number: 3:2020cv01441
Filed: November 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE BY COURT TO COUNSEL re #5 Clerk's Entry of Default. A motion for default judgment must be filed within 60 days from the date of this notice. (bjw, )
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jean L. Gilbert, approving the #4 Request for Entry of Default. (kmc)
January 16, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jean L. Gilbert re #3 Summons Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Attachments: #1 proposed certificate of default)(Manfredi, John)
January 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Jean L. Gilbert served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. (Manfredi, John)
November 24, 2020 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe #1-5 Jane Doe #1-5 in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue a summons for service of process on "John Doe #1-5 Jane Doe #1-5" defendants at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain the defendants identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of "John Doe #1-5 Jane Doe #1-5" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (kmc)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jean L. Gilbert. (kmc)
November 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jean L. Gilbert, John Doe #1-5, and Jane Doe #1-5 filed by The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. {Fee waived - US Government} (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development v. Gilbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean L. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Secretary of the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Represented By: John Manfredi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?