Parker v. Cook Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Parker
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC, Cook Incorporated, Cook Medical Incorporated and Cook Group Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2021cv00304
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in Southern District of Indiana as case 1:21-cv-06391, filed 04/14/2021. (plp)
April 1, 2021 Filing 5 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #134. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Southern District of Indiana for inclusion into MDL-2570 Cook Medical, Inc., IVC Filters Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Richard L. Young, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
April 1, 2021 Case transferred electronically to Southern District of Indiana for inclusion into MDL-2570 Cook Medical, Inc., IVC Filters Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation.(plp)
March 18, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Lisa Parker; Attorney Basil E. Adham, Email address is IVC@johnsonlawgroup.com. Phone number is (713) 626-9336. Admissions due by 4/1/2021. {Emailed to Attorney on 3/18/2021}(see)
March 18, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/16/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
March 18, 2021 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, and Cook Medical LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Cook Medical LLC, #2 Summons for Cook Group Incorporated)(see)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Cook Group Incorporated, Cook Incorporated, and Cook Medical LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5460342) filed by Lisa Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Cook Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Medical Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook Group Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Parker
Represented By: Nicholas R. Farnolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?