Manzer et al v. Maximum Mobility, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nathanael Manzer and Danielle Dean-Manzer
Defendant: Maximum Mobility, LLC, Pride Mobility Products Corp. and Quantum Rehab
Case Number: 3:2021cv00577
Filed: May 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REMAND: It is ORDERED that this case is remanded to the New York State Supreme Court, Tioga County, Index No. 2021-00061776. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 6/11/2021. [Certified copy served upon clerk of the New York Supreme Court in Tioga County via regular mail.] (nmk)
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 LETTER BRIEF by Pride Mobility Products Corp., Quantum Rehab. (Schulman, Jeffrey)
May 26, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint AND, CROSSCLAIM against Maximum Mobility, LLC by Quantum Rehab, Pride Mobility Products Corp..(Sambursky, Neil)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is ORDERED that Defendants Quantum Rehab and Pride Mobility Products Corp. ("the removing Defendants") shall file a memorandum, not to exceed fifteen pages by June 15, 2021, showing cause why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. It is further ORDERED that if the removing Defendants maintain that there is complete diversity between the parties, they shall submit supporting evidence, including affidavits identifying the citizenship of each member of the limited liability company. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiffs may respond to the removing Defendants' submission, with a memorandum not to exceed fifteen pages, on or before June 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 5/25/2021. (nmk)
May 20, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. All conferences will be conducted by way of telephone conference. The parties are directed to call (877) 402-9753 and enter access code 9983518. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/16/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
May 20, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY - Amended the Plaintiff's name to conform to the spelling on the state court complaint; additionally, added "LLC" to party Maximum Mobility to also conform to the party name from the state court complaint. (dpk)
May 20, 2021 ***Answer due date updated for Pride Mobility Products Corp. answer due 5/26/2021; Quantum Rehab answer due 5/26/2021. (dpk)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. (dpk)
May 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court - County of Tioga, case number 2021-00061776 (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5529740) filed by Quantum Rehab and Pride Mobility Products Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Summons and Complaint), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manzer et al v. Maximum Mobility, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathanael Manzer
Represented By: Edward J. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Dean-Manzer
Represented By: Edward J. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maximum Mobility, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pride Mobility Products Corp.
Represented By: Neil L. Sambursky
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantum Rehab
Represented By: Neil L. Sambursky
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Schulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?