Mathewson v. New York State, Office of Mental Health
Plaintiff: Scott Mathewson
Defendant: New York State, Office of Mental Health
Case Number: 3:2021cv00732
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #7 is GRANTED. Defendant is directed to respond to the complaint by September 2, 2021. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/30/2021. (jdp )
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Michael G. McCartin for New York State, Office of Mental Health requesting more time to respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Lovric . (McCartin, Michael)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Mathewson. New York State, Office of Mental Health served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (Hartt, James)
July 7, 2021 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT Scott Mathewson against New York State, Office of Mental Health filed by Scott Mathewson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A - US EEOC Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #3 Proposed Summons Isseud to NYS Office of Mental Health)(Hartt, James)
July 6, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Mathewson. New York State, Office of Mental Health served on 7/6/2021, answer due 7/27/2021. (Hartt, James)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/22/2021 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/15/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to New York State, Office of Mental Health. (hmr)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against New York State, Office of Mental Health (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5566622) filed by Scott Mathewson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. EEOC Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathewson v. New York State, Office of Mental Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Mathewson
Represented By: James D. Hartt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State, Office of Mental Health
Represented By: Michael G. McCartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?