Amory Investments LLC v. Agri Stats, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amory Investments LLC
Defendant: Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Food Group, LLC, Clemens Family Corporation, Hormel Foods Corporation, JBS USA Food Company, Seaboard Foods LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. and Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00798
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #3. Opposition period has expired with no objections pending. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Minnesota for inclusion into MDL-2998 Pork Antitrust Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. John R. Tunheim, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
July 26, 2021 Case transferred electronically to District of Minnesota for inclusion into MDL-2998 Pork Antitrust Litigation. (plp)
July 26, 2021 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in U.S. District of Minnesota as case 0:21-cv-01697, filed 07/26/2021. (amt)
July 14, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: Clerk modified the docket text of the #1 Complaint and caption to correct the spelling of the Plaintiff's name. {This notice was served upon Attorney McAllister via e-mail at rmcallister@bsfllp.com} (pjh, )
July 14, 2021 TEXT NOTICE: Proposed summonses were not submitted with the Complaint for issuance pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Attorney Ryan T. McAllister is hereby directed to file proposed summonses for issuance using the event "Request for Issuance of Summonses." Clerk also notes that Ryan T. McAllister's contact information on the complaint does not match the contact information on file with the Court. Attorney McAllister should update the information on PACER.gov under "Manage My Account," which will prompt an update with the Court. {Copies of all documents filed in this case and this text notice were served upon Attorney McAllister via e-mail at rmcallister@bsfllp.com} (pjh, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Admission Requirement ; Attorney Scott E. Gant, Email address is sgant@bsfllp.com. Phone number is 202-237-2727. Attorney Michael S. Mitchell, Email address is mmitchell@bsfllp.com. Phone number is 202-237-2727. Attorney Colleen Harrison, Email address is charrison@bsfllp.com. Phone number is 914-749-8204. Admissions due by 7/27/2021. {Notice served upon attorneys via e-mail}(pjh, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 10/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/6/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Agri Stats, Inc., Clemens Family Corporation, Clemens Food Group, LLC, Hormel Foods Corporation, JBS USA Food Company, Seabord Foods LLC, Smithfield Foods, Inc., Triumph Foods, LLC, Tyson Foods, Inc., Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc. and Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5583268) filed by Amory Investments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh, ) Modified on 7/14/2021 to correct the spelling of the Plaintiff's name (pjh, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amory Investments LLC v. Agri Stats, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amory Investments LLC
Represented By: Ryan T. McAllister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agri Stats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemens Food Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemens Family Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormel Foods Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JBS USA Food Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaboard Foods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smithfield Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triumph Foods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Prepared Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?