Morse v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Shirley A. Morse
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00857
Filed: July 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
2 Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
3 Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: A Joint Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/27/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The telephonic Rule 16 conference is SET for 11/3/2021 at 10:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. The parties are directed to dial 1-877-873-8017 and enter access code 3362194 to connect to the conference. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/13/2021. (kmc)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe recused. Case reassigned to Judge David N. Hurd for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 8/11/2021. (jel, )
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE PURSUANT TO G.O. 12. Authorized by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/2/2021. (khr)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the complaint in this case, Dkt. No. 1, and determined that this case is not related to Shelley Guyette, et al. v. Ethicon, Inc., et al, No. 20-CV-0261. Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to randomly reassign this case. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on July 30, 2021. (sas)
July 30, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Johnson and Johnson; Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc. on 7/30/2021 by Shirley A. Morse. Waiver of Service due by 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Goldstein, Brian)
July 30, 2021 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: All conferences will be conducted by way of telephone conference. The parties are directed to call (877) 402-9753 and enter access code 9983518. Initial Conference set for 11/3/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/27/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
July 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5601375) filed by Shirley A. Morse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)
July 30, 2021 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination.. (khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morse v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley A. Morse
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?