Singh et al v. American Racing-Tioga Downs Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kapildeo Singh, Lawrence Dumain, Ira Wallach, Brian Wallach, Yves Sarrazin, Erlin Hill, Bruce Soulsby and Alan Weisenberg
Defendant: American Racing-Tioga Downs Inc. doing business as Tioga Downs Casino and Raceway, American Racing-Vernon Downs Inc. doing business as Vernon Downs Racetrack, American Racing and Entertainment, LLC, New Meadowlands Racetrack LLC doing business as Meadowlands Racetrack and Jeffrey R. Gural
Case Number: 3:2021cv00947
Filed: August 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #9 Waiver of Service Executed. Waiver was originally docketed at both docket entries #9 & #10. The document image at #9 was blank but the image at #10 was complete. Clerk moved the completed waiver as docketed originally at #10 to the #9 position and deleted entry #10. (dpk)
September 22, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kapildeo Singh. All Plaintiffs. (Pincus, Alan) (Main Document 9 replaced on 9/28/2021) (dpk, ).
September 10, 2021 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY : Clerk correct #8 as it was filed incorrectly as a Motion to Appoint Counsel when it should have been filed as a Notice of Appearance. (jdp )
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance for all Plaintiffs. filed by Kapildeo Singh. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Pincus, Alan) Modified on 9/10/2021 (jdp, ).
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alan Pincus. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. PLEASE FILE A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE IN THIS CASE ONCE THE ABOVE STEPS ARE COMPLETED OR YOU WILL NOT RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILINGS IN THIS CASE. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 9/3/2021. (sal )
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 Supplemental Admission documents re: #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. (Mollica, Andrew)
September 1, 2021 Notice of Attorney Admission Filing Deficiency re: #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alan Pincus. Pursuant to LR 83.1(d), the sponsor and/or applicant MUST provide the following required documents: a fully completed Petition for Admission to Practice form The corrected documents should be electronically filed with the Court by selecting the 'Supplemental Admission documents' event, which is found under the 'Other Documents' menu. Once all requirements under LR 83.1(d) have been met, the motion will be forwarded to the assigned Magistrate Judge for consideration. (tad, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alan Pincus Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5634076. Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Mollica, Andrew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Kapildeo Singh re #3 Notice of Admission Requirement. Advising the Court that he intends to continue as being counsel of record and is in the process of seeking pro hac vic admission. (khr)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Kapildeo Singh et al: Attorney Alan Pincus, Esq. admissions due by 9/7/2021. (dpk)
August 23, 2021 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/24/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. All conferences will be conducted by way of telephone conference. The parties are directed to call (877) 402-9753 and enter access code 9983518. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/17/2021. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
August 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Racing and Entertainment, LLC, American Racing-Tioga Downs Inc., American Racing-Vernon Downs Inc., Jeffrey R. Gural and New Meadowlands Racetrack LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5624171) filed by Erlin Hill, Lawrence Dumain, Brian Wallach, Yves Sarrazin, Alan Weisenberg, Kapildeo Singh, Bruce Soulsby and Ira Wallach. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Gural Statement on Allard Training Stable), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh et al v. American Racing-Tioga Downs Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kapildeo Singh
Represented By: Andrew J. Mollica
Represented By: Alan Pincus, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Dumain
Represented By: Andrew J. Mollica
Represented By: Alan Pincus, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Wallach
Represented By: Andrew J. Mollica
Represented By: Alan Pincus, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Wallach
Represented By: Andrew J. Mollica
Represented By: Alan Pincus, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yves Sarrazin
Represented By: Andrew J. Mollica
Represented By: Alan Pincus, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erlin Hill
Represented By: Andrew J. Mollica
Represented By: Alan Pincus, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Soulsby
Represented By: Andrew J. Mollica
Represented By: Alan Pincus, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Weisenberg
Represented By: Andrew J. Mollica
Represented By: Alan Pincus, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Racing-Tioga Downs Inc. doing business as Tioga Downs Casino and Raceway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Racing-Vernon Downs Inc. doing business as Vernon Downs Racetrack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Racing and Entertainment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Meadowlands Racetrack LLC doing business as Meadowlands Racetrack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey R. Gural
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?