Wilmington Trust, National Association v. BHCC II, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Defendant: BHCC II, LLC, Alan Weissman, Alfred Weissman and John Doe No. 1 to John Doe No. 100
Case Number: 3:2021cv01319
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
2 Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Rule 7.1 Statement and Civil Cover Sheet served on BHCC II, LLC on 12/27/2021, filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Brandofino, Keith)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER approving #8 Stipulation and granting request for extension of time for all defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to 3/7/2022. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/20/2022. (sg)
January 20, 2022 Filing 8 Stipulation for extension of time for defendants to file response to complaint. (Brandofino, Keith) Modified on 1/20/2022 (sg, ).
January 20, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #8 Stipulation requesting extension of time to respond to complaint: This filing was made under the incorrect event. This filing has been corrected to reflect that this is a stipulation for extension of time for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint submitted for Court approval. (sg)
January 14, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Wilmington Trust, National Association (Rinaldi, Maximiliano)
January 12, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Alan Weissman: answer due 1/18/2022. (sg)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Rule 7.1 Statement and Civil Cover Sheet served on Alan Weissman on 12/27/2021, filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Rinaldi, Maximiliano)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric no longer assigned to case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 12/13/21. (lmw)
December 10, 2021 Filing 4 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wilmington Trust, National Association identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation, Corporate Parent Wilmington Trust, National Association for Wilmington Trust, National Association. Corporate Parent Wilmington Trust Corporation (Brandofino, Keith) Modified on 12/10/2021 (mgh).
December 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Wilmington Trust, National Association; Attorney John M. Doherty, Esq.,, Email address is jack.doherty@hklaw.com. Phone number is (212) 751-3001. Admissions due by 12/27/2021. (mgh)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BHCC II, LLC, Alan Weissman, Alfred Weissman. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Alfred Weissman, #2 Summons Issued as to Alan Weissman)(mgh)
December 10, 2021 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe defendant(s) in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summons(es) for service of process on a John Doe defendant(s) at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the John Doe defendant(s), plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant(s) pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons(es) will be issued at that time. (mgh)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BHCC II, LLC, John Doe No. 1 to John Doe No. 100, Alan Weissman, Alfred Weissman (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5739115) filed by Wilmington Trust, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Trust, National Association v. BHCC II, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Represented By: Keith M. Brandofino
Represented By: Maximiliano Rinaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHCC II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Weissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe No. 1 to John Doe No. 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?