Maple Grove Mobile Home Park v. The 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Maple Grove Mobile Home Park
Defendant: The 3M Company, Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Co., AGC Chemicals Americas Inc., Amerex Corporation, Arkema Inc., Archroma U.S., Inc., BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, Chemdesign Products Inc., Chemguard Inc. Chemicals, Inc., Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., Dupont De Nemours Inc., Dynax Corporation, E. I. Dupont De Nemours and Company, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam, Inc., The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Tyco Fire Products, LP, Doe Defendants 1-20, Chemguard Inc. and Chemicals, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00301
Filed: March 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2022 Filing 28 Letter from Attorney Andrew Croner. (ztc, )
April 13, 2022 Filing 27 Letter from Charles E. Raynal, IV advising of court of transfer. (gmd, )
April 12, 2022 Filing 26 JPMDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-85): Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted as of 4/12/2022. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL-2873 regarding the Aqueous Film-Forming Foams Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Honorable United States District Judge Richard M. Gergel. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (jmb)
April 12, 2022 Case Transferred Electronically to the District of South Carolina for inclusion into MDL 2873. (jmb)
April 12, 2022 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:22-cv-01187, filed 04/12/2022. (jmb)
April 7, 2022 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related 3:22-cv-298 MAD/ML and 3:22-cv-301 MAD/ML. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 4/7/22. (ban)
April 4, 2022 Filing 24 Letter from Attorney Ethan Ware dated 3/31/2022 stating that he will remain as Counsel of record for Defendant Nation Ford Chemical Company. (ztc, )
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #22 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that: (1) the Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 5/4/2022 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, is RE-SCHEDULED for 6/14/2022 at 1:00 p.m., via telephone conference; (2) the Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/7/2022 (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.); and (3) the deadline for Defendants Chemguard Inc. and Tyco Fire Products LP to respond to the complaint is extended to 6/3/2022. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 4/4/2022. (jdp)
April 1, 2022 Filing 22 Letter Request/ Letter Motion from Thomas J. Herten, Esq. for Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP requesting Extension of Time to Answer submitted to Judge Mae D'Agostino . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Answer)(Herten, Thomas)
April 1, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re Answer Deadline Notice, Clerk modified the docket text in this entry to reflect the proper name of the defendant Chemguard Inc. instead of Chemguard Inc. Chemicals Inc. (ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 21 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT ; as to Attorney Ethan R. Ware, Email address is eware@williamsmullen.com. Phone number is 803-567-4610. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorney via e-mail and regular mail}(ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT ; as to Attorney David R. Erickson, Email address is derickson@shb.com., and Attorney Brent Dwerlkotte, Email address is dbdwerlkotte@shb.com. Phone number is (816) 474-6550. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorneys via e-mail and regular mail}(ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT ; as to Attorney Kirk G. Warner, Email address is kwarner@smithlaw.com., Attorney Clifton L. Brinson, Email address is cbrinson@smithlaw.com., and Attorney Addie K.S. Ries, Email address is aries@smithlaw.com. Phone number is (919) 821-1220. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorneys via e-mail and regular mail}(ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT ; as to Attorney Kurt D. Weaver, Email address is kurt.weaver@wbd-us.com. Phone number is (919) 755-6770. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorney via e-mail and regular mail} (ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT ; as to Attorney Kat Hacker, Email address is dupont@bartlitbeck.com. Phone number is (303) 592-3141. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorney via e-mail and regular mail}(ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT ; as to Attorney John Parker, Email address is jparker@goldbergsegalla.com., and Attorney Oliver Twaddell, Email address is otwaddell@goldbergsegalla.com. Phone number is (646) 292-8700. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorneys via e-mail and regular mail} (ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT ; as to Attorney Jonathan Blakley, Email address is jblakley@grsm.com. Phone number is (312) 619-4915. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorney via e-mail and regular mail} (ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT ; as to Attorney Jonathan I. Handler, Email address is jihandler@daypitney.com., and Attorney Keith H. Bensten, Email address is kbensten@daypitney.com. Phone number is (617) 345-4600. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorneys via e-mail and regular mail}(ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT ; as to Attorney Michael L. Carpenter, Email address is mcarpenter@gastonlegal.com. Phone number is 704-865-4400. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorney via e-mail and regular mail}(ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT ; as to Attorney John Wellschlager, Email address is john.wellschlager@dlapiper.com. Phone number is (410) 580-4281. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorney via e-mail and regular mail}(ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT ; as to Attorney Matt Holian, Email address is matt.holian@us.dlapiper.com. Phone number is (617) 406-6009. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorney via e-mail and regular mail}(ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT; as to Attorney Melanie Black Dubis, Email address is melaniedubis@parkerpoe.com., and Attorney Charles Raynal, Email address is charlesraynal@parkerpoe.com. Phone number is (919) 835-4511. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorneys via e-mail and regular mail} (ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT ;as to Attorney Heidi Levine, Email address is hlevine@sidley.com. Phone number is (312) 853-7000. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorney via e-mail and regular mail}(ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT; as to Attorney Jennifer Simon, Email address is jsimon@kmcllaw.com., and Attorney Alan Truitt, Email address is atruitt@kmcllaw.com. Phone number is 404-812-0126. Admissions due by 4/14/2022.{Notice served upon attorneys via e-mail and regular mail} (ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT ; Attorney Peter Condron, Email address is pcondron@crowell.com., Attorney Clifford J. Zatz, Email address is czatz@crowell.com., and Attorney Laura Offenbacher Aradi, Email address is laradi@crowell.com. Phone number is 202-624-2500. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorneys via e-mail and regular mail}(ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT; as to Attorney Daniel L. Ring, Email address is dring@mayerbrown.com. and Attorney Tyler D. Alfermann, Email address is talfermann@mayerbrown.com. Phone number is (312) 782-0600. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorneys via e-mail and regular mail}(ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Maple Grove Mobile Home Park; Attorney Andrew Croner, Email address is ACroner@napolilaw.com. Phone number is (212) 397-1000. Admissions due by 4/14/2022. {Notice served upon attorney via e-mail and regular mail}(ztc, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 5/4/2022 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/27/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (ztc, )
March 31, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Chemguard Inc. answer due 4/6/2022; Tyco Fire Products, LP answer due 4/6/2022. (ztc, ) Modified on 4/1/2022 to edit docket text to reflect that Chemguard Inc. is the proper name of the defendant(ztc, ).
March 31, 2022 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 3:22-cv-298. (ztc, )
March 30, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff Maple Grove Mobile Home Park in NYS Supreme Court, Chenango County. (ztc, )
March 30, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from NYS Supreme Court, Chenango County, Case Number Unassigned (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5854819) filed by Tyco Fire Products, LP, Chemguard Inc. Chemicals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proof of Service)(ztc, ) Modified on 3/31/2022 (ztc, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maple Grove Mobile Home Park v. The 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemdesign Products Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc. Chemicals, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J Herten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. I. Dupont De Nemours and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nation Ford Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Represented By: Keith E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products, LP
Represented By: Thomas J Herten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J Herten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maple Grove Mobile Home Park
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?