Miller's Mobile Home Park v. The 3M Company et al
Plaintiff: Miller's Mobile Home Park
Defendant: The 3M Company, Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Co., AGC Chemicals Americas Inc., Amerex Corporation, Arkema Inc., Archroma U.S., Inc., BASF Corporation, Buckeye Fire Equipment Company, Carrier Global Corporation, Chemdesign Products Inc., Chemguard Inc., Chemicals, Inc., Clariant Corporation, Corteva, Inc., Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., Dupont De Nemours Inc., Dynax Corporation, E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company, Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Nation Ford Chemical Company, National Foam, Inc., The Chemours Company, The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Tyco Fire Products LP and Doe Defendants 1-20
Case Number: 3:2022cv00636
Filed: June 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Mae A D'Agostino
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in District of South Carolina as case 2:22-cv-02117, filed 07/05/2022. (amt)
July 5, 2022 Filing 29 JPMDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-95) Inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted as of 7/5/2022. THE CASE IS TRANSFERRED to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873. Case to be assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Judicial Panel on Multi District Litigation. (jmb)
July 5, 2022 Case Transferred Electronically to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873. (jmb)
June 29, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE by Arkema Inc. re #9 Notice of Admission Requirement /Letter from Heidi Levine to John M. Domurad, Clerk of Court in Response to 6/15/22 Letter (Rothman, Alan)
June 29, 2022 Filing 27 Letter from Kat Hacker re Dkt. #17 Notice of Admission. (gmd, )
June 29, 2022 Filing 26 Letter from Melanie Black Dubis and #1 Letter From Charles E. Raynal re Dkt. #10 Notice of Admission Requirement. (gmd, )
June 21, 2022 Filing 25 Letter from Ethan R. Ware re Dkt #21 Notice of Admission Requirement. (gmd, )
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: The request in stipulation #23 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that the deadline to respond to the complaint by Defendants Chemguard, Inc. and Tyco Fire Products, LP is extended to 8/12/2022. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/21/2022. (jdp )
June 17, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Answer by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products LP submitted to Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order/Judgment Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Answer)(Herten, Thomas)
June 15, 2022 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting Direct Assignment. The cases are deemed related 3:22-cv-637 MAD/ML, 3:22-cv-636 MAD/ML, and 3:22-cv-298 MAD/ML. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 06/15/2022.(ban)
June 15, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Nation Ford Chemical Company; Attorney Ethan R. Ware, Email address is eware@williamsmullen.com. Phone number is 803.567.4610. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/2022(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party E. I. duPont de Nemours and Company, The Chemours Company, and The Chemours Company FC, LLC; Attorney Brent Dwerlkotte, Email address is dbdwerlkotte_shb.com
June 15, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Dynax Corporation; Attorney Kirk G. Warner Clifton L. Brinson Addie K.S. Ries, Email address is kwarner@smithlaw.com cbrinson@smithlaw.com aries@smithlaw.com. Phone number is (919) 821-1220. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/2022(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Deepwater Chemicals Inc.; Attorney Kurt D. Weaver, Email address is kurt.weaver@wbd-us.com. Phone number is (919) 755-6770. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/2022(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Corteva Inc. and DuPont de Nemours Inc.; Attorney Kat Hacker, Email address is dupont@bartlitbeck.com. Phone number is (303) 592-3141. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/2022 (gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Chemicals Inc.; Attorney John Parker and Oliver Twaddell, Email address is jparker@goldbergsegalla.com otwaddell@goldbergsegalla.com. Phone number is (646) 292-8700. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/2022(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party ChemDesign Products Inc.; Attorney Jonathan Blakley, Email address is jblakley@grsm.com. Phone number is (312) 619-4915. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/2022(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. and Carrier Global Corporation; Attorney Jonathan I. Handler and Keith H. Bensten, Email address is kbensten@daypitney.comand jihandler@daypitney.com. Phone number is (617) 345-4600. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/2022(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Buckeye Fire Equipment Company; Attorney Michael L. Carpenter, Email address is mcarpenter@gastonlegal.com. Phone number is 704-865-4400. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/2022(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party BASF Corporation; Attorney John Wellschlager, Email address is john.wellschlager@dlapiper.com. Phone number is (410) 580-4281. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/2022(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party BASF Corporation; Attorney Matt Holian, Email address is matt.holian@us.dlapiper.com. Phone number is (617) 406-6009. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/2022(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Archroma Management LCC and Clariant Corporation; Attorney Melanie Black Dubis and Charles Raynal, Email address is charlesraynal@parkerpoe.com and melaniedubis@parkerpoe.com. Phone number is (919) 835-4511. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/2022(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Arkema Inc.; Attorney Heidi Levine, Email address is hlevine@sidley.com. Phone number is (312) 853-7000. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/2022(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party Amerex Corporation; Attorney Jennifer and Simon Alan Truitt, Email address is jsimon@kmcllaw.com and atruitt@kmcllaw.com. Phone number is 404-812-0126. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/2022(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party AGC Chemicals Americans Inc.; Attorney Clifford J. Zatz and Laura Offenbacher Aradi, Email address is czatz@crowell.com and laradi@crowell.com. Phone number is 202.624.2500. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/2022(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Party 3M Company; Attorney Tyler D. Alfermann, Email address is talfermann@mayerbrown.com. Phone number is (312) 782-0600. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/22.(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Plaintiff; Attorney Andrew Croner, Esq., Email address is ACroner@napolilaw.com. Phone number is (212) 397-1000. Admissions due by 6/29/2022. Notice emailed to attorney 6/15/22(gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 4 TEXT-ONLY NOTICE REGARDING JUDGE D'AGOSTINO CASE DISPOSITION PILOT - Please refer to the Individual Rules and Practices of the Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino, U.S. District Judge, for guidance regarding the Case Disposition Pilot. https://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/sites/nynd/files/MAD_Rules_of_Practice_04_14_2020.pdf. (gmd, )
June 15, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 8/24/2022 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/17/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (gmd, )
June 15, 2022 TEXT Notice pursuant to General Order 12 of Potential Related Case(s), submitted to District Judge for review and determination. Potential Related cases: 3:22-cv-00298-MAD-ML. (gmd, )
June 15, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #2 State Court Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal: Clerk modified the date of filing to the correct date 6/14/22. (gmd, )
June 15, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for AGC Chemicals Americas Inc. answer due 6/22/2022; Amerex Corporation answer due 6/22/2022; Archroma U.S., Inc. answer due 6/22/2022; Arkema Inc. answer due 6/22/2022; BASF Corporation answer due 6/22/2022; Buckeye Fire Equipment Company answer due 6/22/2022; Carrier Global Corporation answer due 6/22/2022; Chemdesign Products Inc. answer due 6/22/2022; Chemguard Inc. answer due 6/22/2022; Chemicals, Inc. answer due 6/22/2022; Clariant Corporation answer due 6/22/2022; Corteva, Inc. answer due 6/22/2022; Deepwater Chemicals, Inc. answer due 6/22/2022; Doe Defendants 1-20 answer due 6/22/2022; Dupont De Nemours Inc. answer due 6/22/2022; Dynax Corporation answer due 6/22/2022; E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company answer due 6/22/2022; Kidde-Fenwal, Inc. answer due 6/22/2022; Nation Ford Chemical Company answer due 6/22/2022; National Foam, Inc. answer due 6/22/2022; The 3M Company answer due 6/22/2022; The Chemours Company answer due 6/22/2022; The Chemours Company FC, LLC answer due 6/22/2022; Tyco Fire Products LP answer due 6/22/2022. (gmd, )
June 14, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT relating to Dkt. #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Plaintiff(s) in the NYS Chenango County Supreme Court, Unassigned. (gmd, ) Modified on 6/15/2022 (gmd, ).
June 14, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, Chenango County, case number Unassigned (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5936208) filed by Tyco Fire Products LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proof of Service)(gmd, ) Modified on 6/15/2022 (gmd, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller's Mobile Home Park v. The 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The 3M Company
Represented By: Daniel L. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Mining & Manufacturing Co.
Represented By: Daniel L. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGC Chemicals Americas Inc.
Represented By: Peter C. Condron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerex Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkema Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Archroma U.S., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BASF Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemdesign Products Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemguard Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clariant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corteva, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dupont De Nemours Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynax Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nation Ford Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Foam, Inc.
Represented By: Keith E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Represented By: David Robert Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyco Fire Products LP
Represented By: Thomas J Herten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miller's Mobile Home Park
Represented By: Patrick James Lanciotti
Represented By: Paul J. Napoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?