Gehm v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jack Gehm
Defendant: Exactech, Inc. and Exactech US, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2022cv00673
Filed: June 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: David N Hurd
Referring Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Filing 21 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY : Clerk filed an Answer from defendants in error. Clerk has deleted the Answer as defendant's have not filed a Notice of Appearance in this case. (jdp)
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER: The request in Stipulation #19 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that Defendants are directed to respond to the complaint by 8/2/2022. All other schedules and deadlines remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 7/20/2022. (jdp )
July 20, 2022 Filing 19 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. (jdp )
June 29, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott P. Schlesinger on behalf of Jack Gehm (Schlesinger, Scott)
June 29, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Gdanski on behalf of Jack Gehm (Gdanski, Jonathan)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/28/2022. (jdp)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/28/2022. (jdp )
June 28, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah J Schultz on behalf of Jack Gehm (Schultz, Sarah)
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 6/28/2022. (jdp)
June 28, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott P. Schlesinger Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5950274. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Registration, #3 Petition, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan R. Gdanski Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5949845. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Registration, #3 Petition, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2022 Filing 10 Supplemental Admission documents re: #9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice,. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sarah J. Schultz Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-5949441. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Registration, #3 Petition, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Exactech US, Inc.; Exactech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued: Exactech US, Inc.)(map)
June 24, 2022 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Jack Gehm is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Exactech, Inc. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2022 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES): Jack Gehm is requesting summons(es) be issued as to Exactech US, Inc. (Haberman, Jeffrey)
June 24, 2022 Filing 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference by Telephone set for 9/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/21/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (map)
June 24, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Plaintiff's Counsel Scott P. Schlesinger, Esq.; Served via email address: scott@schlesingerlaw.com. Phone number is (954) 467-8800. Admissions due by 7/7/2022. (map)
June 24, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Plaintiff's Counsel Sarah J. Schultz, Esq.; Served via email address at: sarah@schlesingerlaw.com. Phone number is: (954) 467-8800. Admissions due by 7/7/2022. (map)
June 24, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Plaintiff's Counsel Jonathan R. Gdanski, Esq.; Served via email address: jonathan@schlesingerlawoffices.com. Phone number is: (954) 467-8800. Admissions due by 7/7/2022. (map)
June 24, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the #1 Complaint. Counsel is reminded for future filings that per General Order 22 pleadings filed with the U.S. District Court should be signed by the currently admitted attorney. NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Proposed Summons(es) were not included with the Complaint. Counsel is directed to file proposed summons(es) on the docket using the REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) event within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 6/28/2022 (map)
June 23, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Exactech US, Inc., Exactech, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-5945887) filed by Jack Gehm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(map)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gehm v. Exactech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Gehm
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Represented By: Jonathan Gdanski
Represented By: Sarah J Schultz
Represented By: Scott P. Schlesinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exactech US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?