Bleuer, et al v. Nigrelli, et al
Plaintiff: Rev. Justin Bleuer, Berean Bible Church, New Yorkers for Constitutional Freedoms, Rev. Jason J. McGuire, Rev. Robert Parker, Rev. Cheryl Parker, Lighthouse Wesleyan Church, Kelly Todd, Bethel Chapel, Rev. H. Ed Reed, Christian Bible Chuch, Dr. Walt Schlundt, Community Bible Church, Rev. Virginia Ogden, The Church of the Good Shepard, Rev. Steve Lamarco, Victor Community Church, Andrew Larson, The Baptist Church of Northville, Rev. Vincent Fusco, New Jerusalem City Church, Keith Henry, New Life Assembly of God, Frank DeLuccio, Brian Rathburn, Lakeshore Community Church, Scott Harris, Grace Bible Church, Jay Riggleman, Bible Baptist Church of Sodus, Raymond Richards, Calvary Assembly of God, Brett Popp, Christian Church of Charleston Four Corners, Tony LaBarca, Crossroads Church, Scott Strobel, First Bible Baptist Church, John Wivell, Independent Baptist Church, Eric Hice, Center Street Baptist Church, Tim Lindsay, Harvest Christian Fellowship, Andrew Fidurko, Mallory Wesleyan Church, Jim Krohn, Southeast Bible Baptist Church, Steve Harness, Wilton Baptist Chirch, Barak Smith, Door to Hope Church, Murray Mumau, Genesee Country Church, Brian Rathbun and Nicholas Buthman
Defendant: Kevin P. Bruen, Michael Korchak, Lori Pettit Riemann, Michael Ferrarese, Andrew J. Wylie, Jack Strollsteimer, William V. Grady, Amanda Nellis, Jeffrey Carpenter, Eric Gonzalez, Gregory J. McCaffrey, Sandra Doorly, Lorraine Diamond, Brian D. Seaman, James Ritts, Joseph V. Cardone, Gregory S. Oakes, Karen A. Heggen, Susan J. Mallery, Brooks Baker, Michael Calrco, Steven A. Nigrelli, Sandra Doorley and Michael D. Calarco
Case Number: 3:2022cv01037
Filed: October 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' motion to stay the case pending resolution of the appeal of the preliminary injunction entered in Antonyuk v Hochul, No. 1:22cv986, dkt. #84 , is hereby GRANTED. The parties shall file a status report every 60 days until the stay is lifted. The Court finds that judicial resources would best be preserved by allowing the Court of Appeals to resolve in an issue identical to the one at issue in this matter. That matter is already before that Court. The first Status Report is due by 2/4/2022. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 12/2/2022. (amt)
December 2, 2022 Filing 99 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint by Jeffrey Carpenter.(Lewandrowski, Lorraine)
December 2, 2022 Filing 98 Letter Motion from Sean W. Costello, Esq. for Lori Pettit Riemann requesting Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint submitted to Judge Lovric . (Costello, Sean)
December 2, 2022 Filing 97 Letter Motion from Brian P. Crosby for Brian D. Seaman requesting Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint submitted to Judge Lovric . (Crosby, Brian)
December 2, 2022 Filing 96 Letter Motion from Nicholas R. Ciappetta for Eric Gonzalez requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Ciappetta, Nicholas)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #93 is GRANTED In Part and DENIED In Part. The deadline for Defendant Lorraine Diamond to respond to the amended complaint is extended to 12/16/2022, without prejudice to renew a motion for further extensions if Motion #84 is not decided by that date. The scheduled Rule 16 Initial Conference and all related deadlines remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/2/2022. (jdp )
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #92 is GRANTED In Part and DENIED In Part. The deadline for Defendant Steven A. Nigrelli to respond to the amended complaint is extended to 12/16/2022, without prejudice to renew a motion for further extensions if Motion #84 is not decided by that date. The scheduled Rule 16 Initial Conference and all related deadlines remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 12/2/2022. (jdp)
December 1, 2022 Filing 93 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Lorraine Diamond. Response to Motion due by 12/22/2022 Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Manion, Meghan)
December 1, 2022 Filing 92 Letter Motion from Michael G. McCartin for Steven A. Nigrelli requesting more time to respond to the Amended Complaint, i.e., until after the Stay Request is ruled upon submitted to Judge Lovric . (McCartin, Michael)
December 1, 2022 Filing 91 LETTER BRIEF in Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Dkt. No. 84 by Steven A. Nigrelli. (McCartin, Michael)
November 30, 2022 Filing 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 Letter Motion from Michael G. McCartin for Steven A. Nigrelli requesting to STAY this action submitted to Judge McAvoy Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 29, 2022 Filing 89 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Answer (John Hubbard, DA Delaware County, NY) served on All Parties on 11/16/22, filed by Jack Strollsteimer. (Miller, Frank)
November 28, 2022 Filing 88 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint by Karen A. Heggen.(Ginsberg, Michael)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 TEXT ORDER directing Plaintiffs file a response to the #84 Letter Motion from Michael G. McCartin for Steven A. Nigrelli requesting to STAY this action. Plaintiffs' Response to Motion due by 11/30/2022. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 11/23/2022. (amt)
November 22, 2022 Filing 86 NOTICE OF ADMISSION REQUIREMENT as to Attorney Susan J. Mallery. Email address is susan.mallery@co.schoharie.ny.us. Phone number is 518-295-2272. Admissions due by 12/6/2022. {Notice served via e-mail and regular mail}(pjh, )
November 22, 2022 Filing 84 Letter Motion from Michael G. McCartin for Steven A. Nigrelli requesting to STAY this action submitted to Judge McAvoy . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Second Circuit Administrative Stay in Antonyuk)(McCartin, Michael)
November 21, 2022 Filing 85 NOTICE filed by Susan J. Mallery. (pjh, )
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 TEXT ORDER: In light of the filing of Status Report #82 and the information contained therein, on or before 11/28/2022: (1) Plaintiffs may, if they so choose, file a Second Amended Complaint correcting and amending matters which they have specifically reported in Status Report #82 ; (2) the Court declines to take on the task and responsibility of making corrections, amendments, deletions, and insertions to Plaintiffs current operative pleading and/or current caption to that pleading, as has been requested and suggested by Plaintiffs in their Status Report #82 ; and (3) Plaintiffs are directed to file either a request for clerks entry of default or a detailed status report as to any Defendant(s) whose time to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs complaint has expired, and as to whom an extension has not been authorized (it is Plaintiffs responsibility going forward to track and timely address any future default situations). All parties are advised that all other deadlines and schedules as reflected in the docket remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/21/2022. (jdp )
November 18, 2022 Filing 82 STATUS REPORT November 18, 2022 by Justin Bleuer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Notice of Appearance of Counsel)(Sieling, David)
November 18, 2022 Filing 81 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Broome County DA served on Lucas Finley, ADA on 11/17/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David) Modified on 11/18/2022 to correct the date the party was served. (pjh, ).
November 18, 2022 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: Clerk modified the docket text of the #81 Affidavit of Service and the #78 Affidavit of Service to correct the dates that the parties were served. (pjh, )
November 18, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Michael Korchak answer due 12/8/2022. (pjh, )
November 17, 2022 Filing 80 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Andrew J. Wylie.(Kelleher, Jacqueline)
November 17, 2022 Filing 79 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Saratoga County DA served on Michael Wells ADA on 10/18/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 17, 2022 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Herkimer County DA served on Kate Valent on 10/13/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David) Modified on 11/18/2022 to correct the date the party was served. (pjh, ).
November 17, 2022 Filing 77 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Chenango County DA served on Chris Curley, ADA on 10/21/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TEXT ORDER: In light of the filing of Answer #75 , no later than 11/21/2022, Plaintiffs and Attorney Miller shall file a joint status report or letter motion addressing the identification of Defendant District Attorney of Delaware County in the Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/17/2022.(jdp )
November 16, 2022 Filing 75 John L. Hubbard as DA of Delaware County ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint by Jack Strollsteimer.(Miller, Frank)
November 16, 2022 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank W. Miller on behalf of Jack Strollsteimer (Miller, Frank)
November 16, 2022 Filing 73 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint by Sandra Doorley.(Shoemaker, Robert)
November 16, 2022 Filing 72 ANSWER to #42 Amended Complaint by James Ritts.(Nacca, Joseph)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #70 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that Defendant Lori Pettit Riemann is directed to respond to the Amended Complaint by December 2, 2022. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/16/2022. (jdp)
November 15, 2022 Filing 70 Letter Motion from Sean W. Costello, Esq. for Lori Pettit Riemann requesting Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint submitted to Judge Lovric . (Costello, Sean)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #68 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that Defendant Andrew Wylie is directed to respond to the Amended Complaint by December 2, 2022. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/15/2022. (jdp )
November 15, 2022 Filing 68 Letter Motion from Jacqueline Kelleher, Esq. for Andrew J. Wylie requesting Extension to respond to Amended Complaint submitted to Judge Hon. Mirosav Lovric . (Kelleher, Jacqueline)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #65 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that Defendant Brian Seaman is directed to respond to the Amended Complaint by December 2, 2022. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/15/2022. (jdp )
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs are directed to file a detailed status report by 11/18/2022 as follows: (1) identifying any Defendant who has been served with the summons and amended complaint and who has failed to timely respond to the amended complaint or seek/obtain an extension of deadline to respond (include date that response deadline expired and reference docket number of affidavit of service; (2) identifying any Defendant who has not yet been served with the summons and amended complaint, with an explanation as to progress/status of service. Plaintiffs are reminded that an affidavit of service of each Defendant must be filed on the docket within 5 days of completion of service and Plaintiffs are reminded to comply with G.O. 25 as filed in Dkt. No. 3. All deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/15/2022. (jdp)
November 15, 2022 Filing 65 Letter Motion from Brian P. Crosby for Brian D. Seaman requesting Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint submitted to Judge Lovric . (Crosby, Brian)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #63 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that Defendant Lorraine Diamond is directed to respond to the Amended Complaint by December 2, 2022. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/15/2022. (jdp )
November 15, 2022 Filing 63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Lorraine Diamond. Response to Motion due by 12/6/2022 Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Manion, Meghan)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #60 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that Defendant Bruen is directed to respond to the Amended Complaint by December 2, 2022. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/15/2022. (jdp )
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #59 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that Defendant Eric Gonzalez is directed to respond to the Amended Complaint by December 2, 2022. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/15/2022. (jdp )
November 15, 2022 Filing 60 Letter Motion from Michael G. McCartin for Steven A. Nigrelli requesting more time to respond to the Amended Complaint submitted to Judge Lovric . (McCartin, Michael)
November 14, 2022 Filing 59 Letter Motion from Nicholas R. Ciappetta for Eric Gonzalez requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint to Amended Complaint submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Ciappetta, Nicholas)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #56 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that Defendant Jeffrey Carpenter is directed to respond to the Amended Complaint by December 2, 2022. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/14/2022. (jdp )
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #54 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that Defendants Gregory Oakes, Joseph Cardone, William Grady, Michael Ferrarese, and Michael Calarco, are directed to respond to the Amended Complaint by December 2, 2022. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/14/2022. (jdp )
November 14, 2022 Filing 56 Letter Motion from Lorraine H. Lewandrowski for Jeffrey Carpenter requesting Extension of Time to Answer submitted to Judge Lovric . (Lewandrowski, Lorraine)
November 14, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Shoemaker on behalf of Sandra Doorley (Shoemaker, Robert)
November 14, 2022 Filing 54 Letter Motion from Barclay Damon LLP for Michael D. Calarco, Joseph V. Cardone, Michael Ferrarese, William V. Grady, Gregory S. Oakes requesting Extension to Respond to Complaint submitted to Judge Lovric . (Pelligra, John)
November 14, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Melvin on behalf of Michael Ferrarese (Melvin, Edward)
November 14, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Pelligra on behalf of Michael Ferrarese (Pelligra, John)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #49 Letter Request requesting to Amend Caption to correct defendant Michael D. Calarco's name. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/7/2022. (jdp )
November 7, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan M. Manion on behalf of Lorraine Diamond (Manion, Meghan)
November 7, 2022 Filing 49 Letter Motion from Barclay Damon LLP on behalf of Defendant Michael D. Calarco for Michael Calrco requesting Amended Caption (misspelt name) submitted to Judge McAvoy . (Pelligra, John)
November 7, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Melvin on behalf of William V. Grady (Melvin, Edward)
November 7, 2022 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Pelligra on behalf of William V. Grady (Pelligra, John)
November 7, 2022 ***Answer due date updated for Michael Calrco, Joseph V. Cardone, Jeffrey Carpenter, Eric Gonzalez, William V. Grady, Gregory S. Oakes, Lori Pettit Riemann, James Ritts, Brian D. Seaman and Andrew J. Wylie answers to the amended complaint due 11/17/2022. (pjh, )
November 4, 2022 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,,,,, by Karen A. Heggen.(Ginsberg, Michael)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ORDER: The request in Letter Brief #44 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that Defendant Karen Heggen is directed to respond to the Amended Complaint by November 28, 2022. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/4/2022. (jdp )
November 4, 2022 Filing 44 LETTER BRIEF Requesting an Extension to Respond to the Amended Complaint by Karen A. Heggen. (Ginsberg, Michael)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #41 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that Defendant Kevin Bruen is directed to respond to the Amended Complaint by November 28, 2022. All other deadlines and schedules remain in effect. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/4/2022. (jdp )
November 3, 2022 Filing 42 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Justin Bleuer.(Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 41 Letter Motion from Michael G. McCartin for Kevin P. Bruen requesting more time to respond to the Complaint submitted to Judge Lovric . (McCartin, Michael)
November 3, 2022 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Wayne County DA served on Bruce Rosenkrans on 10/11/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Steuben County DA served on Bruce Rosenkrans on 10/11/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Schoharie County DA served on Evan Lane on 10/13/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Oswego County DA served on Gregory Oakes on 10/21/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Orleans County DA served on Joseph Cardone on 10/12/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 35 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Ontario County DA served on Heather Hines on 10/15/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 34 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Niagara County DA served on Maria Stoelting on 10/19/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Montgomery County DA served on Kate White on 10/18/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Monr served on Michelle Richardson on 10/28/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Livingston County DA served on Gregory McCaffrey on 10/17/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Kings County DA served on Joann on 10/11/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Fulton County DA served on Amanda Nellis on 10/13/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Dutchess County DA served on Frank Petramale on 10/11/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Delaware County DA served on Shawn Smith on 10/11/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 26 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Clinton County DA served on Andrew J. Wylie on 10/11/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Cattaragus County DA served on Daniel Waasdorp on 10/13/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 3, 2022 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint Bruen NYS Police served on Shannon Brundige on 10/13/2022, filed by Justin Bleuer. (Sieling, David)
November 2, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorraine H. Lewandrowski on behalf of Jeffrey Carpenter (Lewandrowski, Lorraine)
November 2, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Melvin on behalf of Michael Calrco (Melvin, Edward)
November 2, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. McCartin on behalf of Kevin P. Bruen (McCartin, Michael)
November 2, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the #18 Notice of Appearance NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Other Deficiency - The document indicated that the Attorney is appearing for Defendant Joseph V. Cardone and the docket text indicates that the Attorney is appearing for Defendant Michael Calrco. Counsel should file a corrected Notice of Appearance. The correction(s) should be made within 3 days of this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 11/7/2022 (pjh, )
November 1, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Melvin on behalf of Joseph V. Cardone (Melvin, Edward)
November 1, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Pelligra on behalf of Michael Calrco (Pelligra, John)
November 1, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Melvin on behalf of Michael Calrco (Melvin, Edward)
November 1, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Pelligra on behalf of Joseph V. Cardone (Pelligra, John)
November 1, 2022 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING DEFICIENCY regarding the #13 Notice of Appearance NOTICE IS HEREBY GIVEN of the following Filing Deficiency: Attorney email address contained in the document does not match the NYND attorney admission records. Counsel is directed to update their information in PACER within 3 days from this notice. Notice of Filing Deficiency Deadline 11/4/2022 (pjh, )
October 31, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean W. Costello on behalf of Lori Pettit Riemann (Costello, Sean)
October 31, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rhiannon Ineva Gifford on behalf of Karen A. Heggen (Gifford, Rhiannon)
October 31, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Ginsberg on behalf of Karen A. Heggen (Ginsberg, Michael)
October 28, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacqueline M. Kelleher on behalf of Andrew J. Wylie (Kelleher, Jacqueline)
October 26, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ciappetta on behalf of Eric Gonzalez (Ciappetta, Nicholas)
October 26, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward G. Melvin on behalf of Gregory S. Oakes (Melvin, Edward)
October 26, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Pelligra on behalf of Gregory S. Oakes (Pelligra, John)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/25/2022. (jdp )
October 25, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa M. Morton on behalf of Brian D. Seaman (Morton, Melissa)
October 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Crosby on behalf of Brian D. Seaman (Crosby, Brian)
October 24, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicholas R. Ciappetta Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-6078204. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Exhibit(s) Attorney Registration Form, #3 Exhibit(s) Petition for Admission, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Meltzer, Hilary)
October 20, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph S. Nacca on behalf of James Ritts (Nacca, Joseph)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The Rule 16 Initial Conference is scheduled for 1/4/2023 at 10:00 a.m., via Teams telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. The Courtroom Deputy will provide counsel with the Teams link. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/28/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 10/13/2022. (jdp )
October 5, 2022 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial R. 16 Conference set for 1/4/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/28/2022. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (gmd)
October 5, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Amanda Nellis, #1 Andrew J. Wylie, #2 Brian Seaman, #3 Brooks Baker, #4 Eric Gonzales, #5 Gregory McCaffrey, #6 Gregory S. Oakes, #7 Jack Stollsteimer, #8 James Ritts, #9 Jeffrey Carpenter, #10 Joseph V. Cardone, #11 Karen Heggen, #12 Kevin P. Bruen, #13 Lori Pettit, #14 Lorraine Diamond, #15 Michael Caleco, #16 Michael Ferrarese, #17 Michael Korcha, #18 Sandra Doorley, #19 Susan Mallery, #20 William V. Grady.(gmd)
October 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brooks Baker, Kevin P. Bruen, Michael Calrco, Joseph V. Cardone, Jeffrey Carpenter, Lorraine Diamond, Sandra Doorly, Michael Ferrarese, Eric Gonzalez, William V. Grady, Karen A. Heggen, Michael Korchak, Susan J. Mallery, Gregory J. McCaffrey, Amanda Nellis, Gregory S. Oakes, Lori Pettit Riemann, James Ritts, Brian D. Seaman, Jack Strollsteimer, Andrew J. Wylie (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6057596) filed by Door to Hope Church, The Church of the Good Shepard, Virginia Ogden, New Yorkers for Constitutional Freedoms, Harvest Christian Fellowship, Cheryl Parker, Bethel Chapel, Tim Lindsay, New Jerusalem City Church, Scott Strobel, Andrew Fidurko, Tony LaBarca, Jason J. McGuire, Community Bible Church, John Wivell, Victor Community Church, Raymond Richards, Steve Harness, Crossroads Church, Christian Bible Chuch, Keith Henry, Brett Popp, Vincent Fusco, Brian Rathburn, Lakeshore Community Church, Lighthouse Wesleyan Church, New Life Assembly of God, Frank DeLuccio, Jim Krohn, Justin Bleuer, Southeast Bible Baptist Church, Bible Baptist Church of Sodus, Independent Baptist Church, Walt Schlundt, Christian Church of Charleston Four Corners, Grace Bible Church, H. Ed Reed, Wilton Baptist Chirch, First Bible Baptist Church, Genesee Country Church, Scott Harris, Kelly Todd, Robert Parker, Eric Hice, Jay Riggleman, Andrew Larson, Calvary Assembly of God, Center Street Baptist Church, Berean Bible Church, Steve Lamarco, Mallory Wesleyan Church, Barak Smith, The Baptist Church of Northville, Murray Mumau. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(gmd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bleuer, et al v. Nigrelli, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev. Justin Bleuer
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berean Bible Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Yorkers for Constitutional Freedoms
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev. Jason J. McGuire
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev. Robert Parker
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev. Cheryl Parker
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lighthouse Wesleyan Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Todd
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethel Chapel
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev. H. Ed Reed
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Bible Chuch
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Walt Schlundt
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Bible Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev. Virginia Ogden
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Church of the Good Shepard
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev. Steve Lamarco
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Community Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Larson
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Baptist Church of Northville
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rev. Vincent Fusco
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Jerusalem City Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Henry
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Life Assembly of God
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank DeLuccio
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Rathburn
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakeshore Community Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Harris
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Bible Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Riggleman
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bible Baptist Church of Sodus
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Richards
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvary Assembly of God
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Popp
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Church of Charleston Four Corners
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony LaBarca
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crossroads Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Strobel
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Bible Baptist Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wivell
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Independent Baptist Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Hice
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center Street Baptist Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Lindsay
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harvest Christian Fellowship
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Fidurko
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mallory Wesleyan Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Krohn
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southeast Bible Baptist Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Harness
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilton Baptist Chirch
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barak Smith
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Door to Hope Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murray Mumau
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genesee Country Church
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Rathbun
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Buthman
Represented By: Sheldon W. Boyce, Jr.
Represented By: David Christopher Sieling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin P. Bruen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Korchak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Pettit Riemann
Represented By: Sean W. Costello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ferrarese
Represented By: Edward G. Melvin
Represented By: John Joseph Pelligra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew J. Wylie
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Strollsteimer
Represented By: Frank W. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William V. Grady
Represented By: Edward G. Melvin
Represented By: John Joseph Pelligra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Nellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Carpenter
Represented By: Lorraine H. Lewandrowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Gonzalez
Represented By: Nicholas Ciappetta
Represented By: Hilary M. Meltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Doorly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine Diamond
Represented By: Meghan M. Manion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian D. Seaman
Represented By: Brian P. Crosby
Represented By: Melissa M. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ritts
Represented By: Joseph S. Nacca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph V. Cardone
Represented By: Edward G. Melvin
Represented By: John Joseph Pelligra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory S. Oakes
Represented By: Edward G. Melvin
Represented By: John Joseph Pelligra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen A. Heggen
Represented By: Michael E. Ginsberg
Represented By: Rhiannon Ineva Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan J. Mallery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brooks Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Calrco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Nigrelli
Represented By: Michael G. McCartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Doorley
Represented By: Robert J. Shoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Calarco
Represented By: Edward G. Melvin
Represented By: John Joseph Pelligra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?