Comstock et al v. New York State
Plaintiff: Richard Comstock, Joseph White, Kevin McCaffrey, George Borrello, Thomas O'Mara, Mario Mattera, Bill Weber, Jodi Giglio, Andrew Goodell, Steve Hawley, Brian Manktelow, Matt Slater and Robert Smullen
Defendant: New York State, Letitia James, New York State Senate, Andrea Stewart-Cousins, Robert Ortt, New York State Assembly, Carl Heastie, Crystal Peoples-Stokes and William Barclay
Case Number: 3:2023cv00907
Filed: July 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aimee Cowan on behalf of Carl Heastie, Letitia James, New York State, New York State Assembly, New York State Senate, Crystal Peoples-Stokes, Andrea Stewart-Cousins (Cowan, Aimee)
August 23, 2023 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: The request in Response #15 is DENIED insofar as and to the extent that Text Order 14 remains in effect. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/23/2023. (jdc )
August 23, 2023 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Letter Motion from Aimee Cowan for William Barclay, Carl Heastie, Letitia James, New York State, New York State Assembly, New York State Senate, Robert Ortt, Crystal Peoples-Stokes, Andrea Stewart-Cousins requesting 45-day extension to answe filed by George Borrello, Richard Comstock, Jodi Giglio, Andrew Goodell, Steve Hawley, Brian Manktelow, Mario Mattera, Kevin McCaffrey, Thomas O'Mara, Matt Slater, Robert Smullen, Bill Weber, Joseph White. (Vacco, Dennis)
August 23, 2023 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion #13 is GRANTED. Defendants William Barclay, Carl Heastie, Letitia James, New York State, New York State Assembly, New York State Senate, Robert Ortt, Crystal Peoples-Stokes, and Andrea Stewart-Cousins are directed to respond to the complaint by 10/20/2023. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 8/23/2023. (jdc )
August 22, 2023 Filing 13 Letter Motion from Aimee Cowan for William Barclay, Carl Heastie, Letitia James, New York State, New York State Assembly, New York State Senate, Robert Ortt, Crystal Peoples-Stokes, Andrea Stewart-Cousins requesting 45-day extension to answer complaint submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Cowan, Aimee)
August 18, 2023 ***Answer due date updated for William Barclay answer due 8/31/2023; Carl Heastie answer due 8/31/2023; Letitia James answer due 8/30/2023; New York State answer due 9/5/2023; New York State Assembly answer due 8/30/2023; New York State Senate answer due 8/30/2023; Robert Ortt answer due 9/5/2023; Crystal Peoples-Stokes answer due 8/31/2023; Andrea Stewart-Cousins answer due 8/31/2023. (khr)
August 17, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; General Order 25 served on Crystal Peoples-Stokes on 08/10/2023, filed by George Borrello, Richard Comstock, Jodi Giglio, Andrew Goodell, Steve Hawley, Brian Manktelow, Mario Mattera, Kevin McCaffrey, Thomas O'Mara, Matt Slater, Robert Smullen, Bill Weber, Joseph White. (Vacco, Dennis)
August 17, 2023 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; General Order 25 served on William Barclay on 08/10/2023, filed by George Borrello, Richard Comstock, Jodi Giglio, Andrew Goodell, Steve Hawley, Brian Manktelow, Mario Mattera, Kevin McCaffrey, Thomas O'Mara, Matt Slater, Robert Smullen, Bill Weber, Joseph White. (Vacco, Dennis)
August 17, 2023 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; General Order 25 served on Robert Ortt on 08/14/2023, filed by George Borrello, Richard Comstock, Jodi Giglio, Andrew Goodell, Steve Hawley, Brian Manktelow, Mario Mattera, Kevin McCaffrey, Thomas O'Mara, Matt Slater, Robert Smullen, Bill Weber, Joseph White. (Vacco, Dennis)
August 17, 2023 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; General Order 25 served on Andrea Stewart-Cousins on 08/10/2023, filed by George Borrello, Richard Comstock, Jodi Giglio, Andrew Goodell, Steve Hawley, Brian Manktelow, Mario Mattera, Kevin McCaffrey, Thomas O'Mara, Matt Slater, Robert Smullen, Bill Weber, Joseph White. (Vacco, Dennis)
August 17, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; General Order 25 served on Carl Heastie on 08/10/2023, filed by George Borrello, Richard Comstock, Jodi Giglio, Andrew Goodell, Steve Hawley, Brian Manktelow, Mario Mattera, Kevin McCaffrey, Thomas O'Mara, Matt Slater, Robert Smullen, Bill Weber, Joseph White. (Vacco, Dennis)
August 17, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; General Order 25 served on New York State Attorney General on 08/09/2023, filed by George Borrello, Richard Comstock, Jodi Giglio, Andrew Goodell, Steve Hawley, Brian Manktelow, Mario Mattera, Kevin McCaffrey, Thomas O'Mara, Matt Slater, Robert Smullen, Bill Weber, Joseph White. (Vacco, Dennis)
August 17, 2023 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; General Order 25 served on New York State on 08/14/2023, filed by George Borrello, Richard Comstock, Jodi Giglio, Andrew Goodell, Steve Hawley, Brian Manktelow, Mario Mattera, Kevin McCaffrey, Thomas O'Mara, Matt Slater, Robert Smullen, Bill Weber, Joseph White. (Vacco, Dennis)
August 17, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; General Order 25 served on New York State Senate on 08/09/2023, filed by George Borrello, Richard Comstock, Jodi Giglio, Andrew Goodell, Steve Hawley, Brian Manktelow, Mario Mattera, Kevin McCaffrey, Thomas O'Mara, Matt Slater, Robert Smullen, Bill Weber, Joseph White. (Vacco, Dennis)
August 17, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; General Order 25 served on New York State Assembly on 08/09/2023, filed by George Borrello, Richard Comstock, Jodi Giglio, Andrew Goodell, Steve Hawley, Brian Manktelow, Mario Mattera, Kevin McCaffrey, Thomas O'Mara, Matt Slater, Robert Smullen, Bill Weber, Joseph White. (Vacco, Dennis)
July 31, 2023 TEXT NOTICE: The Initial Conference scheduled for 11/1/2023 at 2:30PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send the parties a team link to participate. (jdc ) (jdc )
July 27, 2023 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/1/2023 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/25/2023. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (khr)
July 27, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Letitia James. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to State of New York, #2 Summons issued s to New York State Senate, #3 Summons issued as toAndrea Stewart-Cousins, #4 Summons issued as to Robert Ortt, #5 Summons issued as to Carl Heastie, #6 Summons issued as to William Barclay, #7 Summons issued as to New York State Assembly, #8 Summons issued as to Crystal Peoples-Stokes)(khr)
July 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Barclay, Carl Heastie, Letitia James, New York State, New York State Assembly, New York State Senate, Robert Ortt, Crystal Peoples-Stokes, Andrea Stewart-Cousins (Filing fee $402 receipt number ANYNDC-6384996) filed by Brian Manktelow, Kevin McCaffrey, Richard Comstock, Steve Hawley, Thomas O'Mara, Mario Mattera, Andrew Goodell, Robert Smullen, Matt Slater, Joseph White, Jodi Giglio, George Borrello, Bill Weber. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(khr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comstock et al v. New York State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Comstock
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph White
Represented By: Scott Allen
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin McCaffrey
Represented By: Scott Allen
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Borrello
Represented By: Scott Allen
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas O'Mara
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Mattera
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Weber
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Giglio
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Goodell
Represented By: Scott Allen
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Hawley
Represented By: Scott Allen
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Manktelow
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Slater
Represented By: Scott Allen
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Smullen
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State
Represented By: Aimee Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letitia James
Represented By: Aimee Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Senate
Represented By: Aimee Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Stewart-Cousins
Represented By: Aimee Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Ortt
Represented By: Aimee Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Assembly
Represented By: Aimee Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Heastie
Represented By: Aimee Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Peoples-Stokes
Represented By: Aimee Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barclay
Represented By: Aimee Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?