OneBeacon America Insurance Company v. Fulton Boiler Works, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Defendant: Fulton Boiler Works, Inc., Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Cross_claimant: Employers Insurance Company of Wausau and Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Cross_defendant: Fulton Boiler Works, Inc. and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Case Number: 5:2013cv01525
Filed: December 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Syracuse Office
County: Oswego
Presiding Judge: Mae A. D'Agostino
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that Fulton's motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of Travelers' notice defense (Dkt. No. 150) is GRANTED in part; the Court further ORDERS that Travelers' motion fo r partial summary judgment on the issue of Travelers' notice defense (Dkt. No. 151) is DENIED; the Court further ORDERS that Travelers' motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of equitable contribution (Dkt. No. 152) is DENIED; the Court further ORDERS that Lamorak's motion for partial summary judgment on the issue of equitable contribution (Dkt. No. 153) is DENIED; the Court further ORDERS that Travelers' motion to strike the affidavit of Martin Martinovic is DENIED ; the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum-Decision and Order upon the parties in accordance with the Local Rules. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 2/19/2019. (ban)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER denying 91 Motion for Reconsideration re 91 MOTION for Reconsideration re 89 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed by Fulton Boiler Works, Inc.: The Court hereby ORDERS that Defen dant Fulton Boiler Works, Inc.'s motion for reconsideration is DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendant Fulton Boiler Works, Inc.'s motion for leave to amend its answer is GRANTED; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 11/23/2016. (ban, )
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER denying 59 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 76 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment: The Court he reby ORDERS that Defendant Fulton Boiler Works, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment pursuant to Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Dkt. No. 59) is DENIED as moot; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendant Fulton Boiler Works, I nc.'s motion for attorneys' fees and costs associated with their motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. No. 59) is DENIED (Dkt. No. 56) ; and the Court further ORDERS that the Parties are directed to file a stipulation discontinuing Pl aintiff OneBeacon America Insurance Company's first cause of action against Fulton Boilers Works, Inc. within thirty (30) days of the date of this decision; and the Court further ORDERS that the Parties are directed to file a stipulation discon tinuing Defendant Insurance Company of Wausau/Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company's first cross-claim against Fulton Boiler Works, Inc. within thirty (30) days of the date of this decision; and the Court further ORDERS that, if the Parties f ail to file the stipulations discontinuing the identified claims, Defendant Fulton Boiler Works, Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. No. 59) is DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendant Fulton Boiler Works, Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment (Dkt. No. 60) is DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendant Travelers Casualty and Surety Company's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 76) pursuant to Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Procedure i s DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that Defendant Travelers Casualty and Surety Company's motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 78) pursuant to Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Procedure is DENIED; and the Court further ORDERS that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Order on all parties in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 3/28/2016. (ban)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OneBeacon America Insurance Company v. Fulton Boiler Works, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OneBeacon America Insurance Company
Represented By: Kristin V. Gallagher
Represented By: Joanna L. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton Boiler Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Insurance Company of Wausau
Represented By: Jennifer V. Schiffmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer V. Schiffmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Represented By: Robert W. Mauriello, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Employers Insurance Company of Wausau
Represented By: Jennifer V. Schiffmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer V. Schiffmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Fulton Boiler Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Represented By: Robert W. Mauriello, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?