United States of America, ex rel. John Rubar v. The Hayner Hoyt Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: |
United States of America, ex rel. John Rubar |
Defendant: |
The Hayner Hoyt Corporation, Jeremy Thurston, Gary Thurston, LeMoyne Interiors, Doyner, Inc., Ralph Bennett and 229 Constructors, LLC |
Counter_claimant: |
Doyner, Inc. |
Counter_defendant: |
United States of America, ex rel. John Rubar |
Intervenor: |
The Travelers Indemnity Company |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv00830 |
Filed: |
July 10, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Syracuse Office |
County: |
Onondaga |
Presiding Judge: |
Christian F. Hummel |
Presiding Judge: |
Gary L. Sharpe |
Nature of Suit: |
False Claims Act |
Cause of Action: |
31 U.S.C. § 3729 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 5, 2018 |
Filing
114
PROTECTIVE ORDER: setting for the terms and conditions for the exchange of information, documents and materials in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 11/5/2018. (jmb)
|
September 18, 2018 |
Filing
108
MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Pltf's 86 Motion to Compel; denying Deft's 89 Motion for Protective Order. Ordered that pursuant to the terms of this Memorandum-Decision and Order, parties must comply with the discovery deadlines as stated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on September 18, 2018. (jdp, )
|
January 25, 2018 |
Filing
98
MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER - That defendants' 30 motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: GRANTED with respect to the FCA retaliation claim (fourth claim) as against Gary Thurston, Jeremy Thurston, Ralph Benne tt, Lemoyne Interiors, and 229 Constructors, LLC, the NIED claim (seventh claim) as against all defendants, and the tortious interference with contract claim (ninth claim) as against all defendants; and DENIED in all other respects. That defendants shall file an appropriate responsive pleading within the time allotted by the rules. That Rubar's 31 motion for attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: GRANTED to the extent that attorneys& #039; fees in the amount of $206,374.50 and costs and expenses in the amount of $2,070.85 are imposed against defendants; and DENIED in all other respects. That Travelers' 65 motion to intervene is GRANTED and Travelers shall file its pleading on or before February 8, 2018. That the parties shall contact Magistrate Judge Hummel to schedule further proceedings in accordance with this order. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 1/25/2018. (jel, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?