Irvine v. City of Syracuse et al
Plaintiff: |
Jason Irvine |
Defendant: |
City of Syracuse, Alexander J. Cazzolli, Brian Fougnier, JP Locastro, Kevin E. Walsh and Matthew Liadka |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv01565 |
Filed: |
December 24, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Syracuse Office |
County: |
Cayuga |
Presiding Judge: |
David E. Peebles |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas J. McAvoy |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 21, 2017 |
Filing
83
ORDER - Defendants' motion to dismiss for failure to prosecute and supplemental motion to dismiss for failure to prosecute, dkt. #s 73, 77, are hereby DENIED. The Plaintiff is hereby WARNED THAT FAILURE TO PARTICIPATE IN DISCOVERY AS DIRECTED BY THE COURT COULD LEAD THE COURT TO DISMISS THE CASE. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 11/21/2017. (Copy served via regular mail)(jel, )
|
June 9, 2016 |
Filing
33
DECISION & ORDER on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Dkt. No. 22 . Defendant's motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's constitutional medical indifference claims against defendants Liadka and Cazzolli are dismissed wi th leave to replead. Defendants' motion is denied as to the excessive force claims against defendants Liadka and Cazzolli. Plaintiff is granted leave of 30 days to file an amended complaint. Plaintiff is advised that an amended complaint supe rsedes in all respects the prior pleading. If plaintiff files an amended complaint, he must properly allege in the amended complaint all factual bases for all claims asserted therein. The failure to file an amended complaint within this time frame will be deemed as an abandonment of the dismissed claims, and a "with prejudice" dismissal will be entered on the Court's docket without further order by the Court. Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 6/9/2016. (lah)[copy served on pltf by regular mail]
|
May 19, 2015 |
Filing
10
DECISION and ORDER. The Court ADOPTS the Report and Recommendation, Dkt. No. 9 . ORDERED that with the exception of plaintiff's excessive force and deliberate medical indifference claims asserted against defendants Liadka and Cazzolli, the rem aining claims in this action (including all of those asserted against defendants Fougnier, Locastro, Walsh, and the City of Syracuse) are DISMISSED with leave to replead. Plaintiff must replead within 30 days from the date of this Decision and Order. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 5/19/2015. [Copies of order sent by regular mail and certified return receipt] (lah, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?