Nationstar Mortgage LLC v. Laffrey et al
Plaintiff: |
Nationstar Mortgage LLC |
Defendant: |
John J. Laffrey, Kathryn A. Laffrey and Amalgamated Bank |
Case Number: |
5:2016cv00280 |
Filed: |
March 8, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Syracuse Office |
County: |
Onondaga |
Presiding Judge: |
Therese Wiley Dancks |
Presiding Judge: |
Frederick J. Scullin |
Nature of Suit: |
Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 27, 2017 |
Filing
21
ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS that Plaintiff's # 20 motion is GRANTED. The Court further ORDERS that the # 16 Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale is VACATED pursuant to Rule 60(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court further ORDE RS that the Referee, Thomas Robertson, Esq., whom the Court appointed to sell the property, pursuant to the Order and Judgment of Foreclosure and Sale is DISCHARGED and relieved of any and all obligations and requirements thereunder. The Court furthe r ORDERS that this action is voluntarily DISMISSED pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Court further ORDERS that, pursuant to New York Civil Practice Law and Rules § 6514(a), the County Clerk of the County of Onondag a is DIRECTED, upon the payment of proper fees, if any, to cancel and discharge the Notice of Pendency filed in the Office of the Clerk of the County of Onondaga on March 16, 2016, and in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court, N orthern District of New York, on March 28, 2016, and any other filing against the property listed herein, and said Clerk is hereby DIRECTED to enter upon the margin of the record of the same a Notice of Cancellation referring to this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. on 3/27/2017. (nmk)
|
February 7, 2017 |
Filing
17
DEFAULT JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Plaintiff's motion for the entry of a default judgment against Defendants John J. Laffrey and Kathryn A. Laffrey in the total amount of $125,735.55 is GRANTED. (nmk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?