Morris v. Martin et al
Plaintiff: Willie Morris
Defendant: Jason Martin, Jason Seward, David Soares, Steve Korkoff, City of Albany and County of Albany
Case Number: 5:2016cv00601
Filed: May 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Syracuse Office
County: Cayuga
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Presiding Judge: Norman A. Mordue
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER that Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. No. 69 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiff's Section 1983 claims for malicious prosecution and deprivation of a fair trial may proceed as aga inst Defendants Martin and Seward. Plaintiff's remaining claims are dismissed with prejudice. Defendants Chief Krokoff and City of Albany are hereby dismissed from the case. Signed by Senior Judge Norman A. Mordue on 10/23/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Case law) (Copy served upon plaintiff via regular mail)(sal )
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: It is ORDERED that the # 27 Report and Recommendation is adopted and accepted. It is further ORDERED that the Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice as against District Attorney Soares and Albany County. It i s also ORDERED that the case shall proceed against the remaining defendants Jason Martin, Jason Seward, Steve Korkoff, and the City of Albany. It is ORDERED that the # 37 Order denying defendants' motion without prejudice is vacated. It is O RDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to reopen defendants' # 34 Motion. Lastly, it is ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to serve copies of this Memorandum-Decision and Order in accordance with the Local Rules of the Northern District of New York. Signed by Senior Judge Norman A. Mordue on March 22, 2017. {Copy sent to the pro se plaintiff at Upstate Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 2001, Malone, NY 12953 via regular mail}.(rep)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER denying 34 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Norman A. Mordue on 3/17/17. (Copy served via regular mail)(sfp, )
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM-DECISION AND ORDER: ACCEPTING the # 4 Report and Recommendations. It is ORDERED that the # 1 Complaint is dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend against defendants City of Albany and Albany County. It is further ORDERED t hat the Court dismisses with prejudice, on grounds of absolute immunity, all claims against District Attorney Soares, except for the following claims, which the Court dismisses without prejudice and with leave to amend: (1) the claims that District A ttorney Soares created practices and policies that he and Jason Martin used to pursue and falsely charge defendant; and (2) the claims that that Soares failed to supervise and discipline the agents he used to investigate criminal charges against plai ntiff; and it is further ORDERED that the action shall proceed against defendants Jason Martin, Jason Seward, and Steve Korkoff; and these defendants, or their counsel, shall file a response in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. Additionally, it i s ORDERED that any amended complaint must be a complete pleading that supersedes the original complaint in all respects (and does not incorporate by reference any portion of his original complaint); and that plaintiff shall not reassert any claims th at have been dismissed with prejudice; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to serve copies of this Memorandum-Decision and Order in accordance with the Local Rules of the Northern District of New York. Signed by Senior Judge Norman A. Mordue on July 28, 2016. {A copy of this Order was sent to the plaintiff at Auburn Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 618, Auburn, NY 13021 via regular U.S. Postal Mail}. (rep)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Seward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Soares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Korkoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Albany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Albany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?