Jackson v. Gunsalus et al
Plaintiff: |
Kelvin Jackson |
Defendant: |
John Gunsalus and William Lashomb |
Case Number: |
5:2016cv00647 |
Filed: |
June 7, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of New York |
Office: |
Syracuse Office |
County: |
Onondaga |
Presiding Judge: |
Therese Wiley Dancks |
Presiding Judge: |
Gary L. Sharpe |
Nature of Suit: |
Assault, Libel, and Slander |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 28, 2018 |
Filing
111
ORDER denying 97 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 11/28/2018. (Copy served on plaintiff via regular mail)(rjb, )
|
July 25, 2016 |
Filing
6
ORDER: that the Report-Recommendation and Order (Dkt. No. 5 ) is Adopted in its entirety; that the complaint (Dkt. No. 1 ) be Dismissed with Prejudice and Without Leave to Amend against Defendants Gunsalus, Lashomb, Smith and Fowler in their offic ial capacities; and Ordered that the complaint be Dismissed with prejudice and without leave to amend against Defendant Syracuse Police Department; that the complaint be Dismissed without prejudice and with leave to amend against Defendants Smith, Fo wler, and the City of Syracuse; that this action be allowed to proceed against Defendants Gunsalus and Lashomb in their individual capacities on Plaintiff's § 1983 claims for excessive force and assault and batter, and that Defendant or the ir counsel, be required to file a response as provided for in Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; that within thirty (30) days of the date of this order, plaintiff may file an amended complaint, a complete pleading that supersedes his or iginal complaint in all respects and shall not include any claims that have been dismissed with prejudice by this court; and that the clerk of the court serve a copy of this order upon the parties in accordance with this court's Local Rules. Signed by Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 07/25/2016. (hmr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?