Phillips v. Proud et al
Plaintiff: Clifton Phillips
Defendant: David Proud, Paul Rigby, Syracuse Police Department, New York State Division of Parole, G.I.V.E. Operation Impact, Michael Ferrante, Paul Casler, City of Syracuse, State of New York, William Summers, Scott Fura, David Metz, U.S. Marshal Service, Jason Eiffe, Gang Violence Task Force and Jeffrey Ballagh
Case Number: 5:2016cv01140
Filed: September 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Syracuse Office
County: Onondaga
Presiding Judge: Andrew T. Baxter
Presiding Judge: Gary L. Sharpe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 DECISION AND ORDERED, that Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 54) is GRANTED, and the Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice as to all claims except for the malicious prosecution claim, which is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on October 30, 2018. (Copy served via regular and certified mail)(sas)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ORDER: Amending the # 10 Order on the # 9 Report and Recommendations, amended to direct the Clerk to issue a summons for defendant David Metz, as he was inadvertently omitted from the previous order, the Clerk is also directed to schedule a Rule 16 Conference now that the plaintiff is no longer incarcerated. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 3/10/2017. (Copy served upon the Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail, as well as upon the Office of Corporation Counsel for the City of Syracuse, the Onondaga County Attorney's Office and the Attorney General of the State of New York) (jmb)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: It is Ordered that the # 9 Report and Recommendation is APPROVED and ADOPTED in its entirety. It is Ordered that any claims against defendants Syracuse Police Department, U.S. Marshal's Service, New York State Division of Parole, G.I.V. E. Operation Impact, State of New York and Gang Violence Task Force are DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to issue summonses and forward them, along with copies of the Complaint to the United States Marshal for service upon defendants D avid Proud, Paul Rigby, Michael Ferrante, Paul Casler, City of Syracuse, William Summers, Scott Fura, Jason Eiffe and Jeffrey Ballagh. The Clerk shall also forward a copy of the Summons and Complaint to the Office of Corporation Counsel of the City o f Syracuse, the Onondaga County Attorney's Office and the Attorney General of the State of New York together with a copy of the Report-Recommendation. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 3/8/2017. (Copy served upon the Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail) (jmb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Proud et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Proud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Rigby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syracuse Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Division of Parole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.I.V.E. Operation Impact
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ferrante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Casler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Syracuse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Fura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Metz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Marshal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Eiffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gang Violence Task Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Ballagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?