Troise v. SUNY Cortland NY
Plaintiff: Robert J Troise
Defendant: SUNY Cortland NY
Case Number: 5:2018cv00734
Filed: June 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Office: Syracuse Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Andrew T. Baxter
Presiding Judge: Brenda K. Sannes
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting Defendant's 66 Motion for Summary Judgment in its entirety and dismissing Plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 1/8/2021 (Copy served on pltf via regular and certified mail.) (rjb, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that Plaintiff's ADEA claim against SUNY Cortland is DISMISSED with prejudice under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(iii) because it is barred by Eleventh Amendment immunity and that Defendant's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 21 ) the Title VII cause of action is DENIED. Signed by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 8/14/2019. (Copy served on Plaintiff via regular mail)(rjb, )
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECISION & ORDER: that the Clerk is directed to file Docket No. 12 as Exhibit 1 to pltf's complaint, and the Clerk is directed to file Dkt. No. 5 as Exhibit 2 to pltf's complaint; that pltf's 2 IFP application is GRANTED. The Clerk s hall issue a summons and forward it, along with a copy of the complaint, together with Exhibits 1-2, a packet containing GO25 and the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Discrimination Cases Alleging Adverse Action to the US Marshal for servic e upon the named deft; and that the Clerk provide pltf with a copy of the Discovery Protocols for Employment Discrimination Cases Alleging Adverse Action. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/7/2018. (Copy served upon Robert J Troise via regular mail on 8/7/2018)(see)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DECISION & ORDER: that pltf be given UNTIL FRIDAY, 8/10/2018, within which to submit a proposed amended complaint to this court, or request an extension of time to submit a proposed amended complaint, clarifying his claims as the court has discussed above. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/25/2018. (Copy served upon Robert J Troise via regular mail on 6/26/2018)(see)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troise v. SUNY Cortland NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Troise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNY Cortland NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?