Casler-Tyrrell et al v. Auburn Community Hospital et al

Plaintiff: David Casler-Tyrrell, Bryan Casler-Tyrrell and Julie Casler-Tyrrell
Defendant: Paul Koenig, MD, Auburn Community Hospital and Althea Suslik, FNP
Case Number: 5:2018cv00892
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Syracuse Office
County: Cayuga
0 Judge: David E Peebles
1 Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2018 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Althea Suslik, FNP. (Carafa, Thomas)
September 26, 2018 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, With Jury Demand by Althea Suslik, FNP.(Carafa, Thomas)
September 24, 2018 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #11 Notice of Appearance: Clerk removed "Notice of Appearance by Alicia M. Dodge" and added "Jury Demand" since the incorrect event was used for this filing. (hmr)
September 21, 2018 11 JURY DEMAND on behalf of Auburn Community Hospital. (Dodge, Alicia) Modified on 9/24/2018 (hmr).
September 14, 2018 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Paul Koenig, MD. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Fogel, Danielle)
September 12, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Carafa on behalf of Althea Suslik, FNP (Carafa, Thomas)
September 5, 2018 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bryan Casler-Tyrrell. Paul Koenig, MD waiver sent on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Santola, Daniel)
September 5, 2018 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bryan Casler-Tyrrell. Althea Suslik, FNP waiver sent on 9/4/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Santola, Daniel)
August 24, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul D. Jureller on behalf of Auburn Community Hospital (Jureller, Paul)
August 23, 2018 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Auburn Community Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Notice of appearance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Dodge, Alicia)
August 1, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Santola on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Santola, Daniel)
August 1, 2018 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/30/2018 at 09:30 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/23/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
August 1, 2018 2 Summonses Issued as to Auburn Community Hospital, Paul Koenig, MD, Althea Suslik, FNP. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued for Paul Koenig, MD, #2 Summons Issued for Paul Koenig, MD, #3 Summons Issued for Althea Suslik, FNP)(hmr)
July 31, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Auburn Community Hospital, Paul Koenig, MD, Althea Suslik, FNP (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4464984) filed by Bryan Casler-Tyrrell, Julie Casler-Tyrrell, David Casler-Tyrrell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casler-Tyrrell et al v. Auburn Community Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Casler-Tyrrell
Represented By: Laura M. Jordan
Represented By: Daniel R. Santola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Casler-Tyrrell
Represented By: Laura M. Jordan
Represented By: Daniel R. Santola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Casler-Tyrrell
Represented By: Laura M. Jordan
Represented By: Daniel R. Santola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Koenig, MD
Represented By: Danielle Mikalajunas Fogel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auburn Community Hospital
Represented By: Paul D. Jureller
Represented By: Alicia M. Dodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Althea Suslik, FNP
Represented By: Thomas P. Carafa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?