Ward v. Town of Summer Hill et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Ward
Defendant: Cayuga County and Town of Summer Hill
Case Number: 5:2018cv01053
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Filing 11 Town of Summerhill's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Matthew Ward by Town of Summer Hill.(Smith, Thomas)
October 25, 2018 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: approving the #9 Stipulation. The time for defendant Cayuga County to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 11/9/2018. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/25/2018. (nmk)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Cayuga County submitted to Judge No. (Picciotti, Joseph)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Picciotti, III on behalf of Cayuga County (Picciotti, Joseph)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: approving the #6 Stipulation. The time for defendant Town of Summer Hill to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 11/2/2018. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/5/2018. (nmk)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #2 Summons Issued to Extend Time to Answer by Town of Summer Hill submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Galbato, Suzanne)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne O. Galbato on behalf of Town of Summer Hill (Galbato, Suzanne)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R. Smith on behalf of Town of Summer Hill (Smith, Thomas)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 12/4/2018 at 10:00 AM by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/27/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, )
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Cayuga County, Town of Summer Hill. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(sfp, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Cayuga County, Town of Summer Hill (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4497683) filed by Matthew Ward. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Town of Summer Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cayuga County
Represented By: Joseph Picciotti, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Summer Hill
Represented By: Suzanne O. Galbato
Represented By: Thomas R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Ward
Represented By: Melody Domenica Westfall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?