Timmons v. Kingsley-Johnston, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Genevieve Timmons
Defendant: Cobblestone Square Apartments, LLC, Kingsley-Johnston, Inc and Deanna Johnston
Case Number: 5:2018cv01087
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
0 Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
1 Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cobblestone Square Apartments, LLC, Deanna Johnston, Kingsley-Johnston, Inc.(Jones, Christian)
October 10, 2018 ***Answer due date updated for Cobblestone Square Apartments, LLC answer due 10/15/2018; Deanna Johnston answer due 10/15/2018; Kingsley-Johnston, Inc answer due 10/15/2018. (dpk)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Filing Order served on Kingsley-Johnston, Inc.; Cobblestone Square Apartments, LLC; Deanna Johnston on 9/22/18, filed by Genevieve Timmons. (Kirchner, Conor)
September 12, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cobblestone Square Apartments, LLC, Deanna Johnston and Kingsley-Johnston, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Cobblestone Square Apartments LLC, #2 Summons Issued as to Deanna Johnston) (dpk)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. All conferences are conducted by telephone. Plaintiff's attorney will initiate the call (unless the Court directs differently) and shall contact Judge Dancks' Chambers at 315-234-8618 (a dedicated line solely for telephone conferences) once all parties are on the line. Counsel may use a teleconferencing service for assistance initiating conference calls to the Court. For cases involving pro se parties, the Court will initiate the call for the Rule 16 Conference. Pro se parties are instructed to provide the Court with a telephone number where they may be reached for a conference call. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/4/2018. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cobblestone Square Apartments, LLC, Deanna Johnston and Kingsley-Johnston, Inc (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4504044) filed by Genevieve Timmons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timmons v. Kingsley-Johnston, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobblestone Square Apartments, LLC
Represented By: Christian P. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingsley-Johnston, Inc
Represented By: Christian P. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Johnston
Represented By: Christian P. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genevieve Timmons
Represented By: Conor J. Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?