Dalola v. Interface Performance Materials, Inc.

Plaintiff: John Dalola
Defendant: Interface Performance Materials, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv01475
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: granting #5 Letter Request for an extension of time. The time for defendant Interface Performance Materials, Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 3/15/2019. A joint Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/16/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The telephonic Rule 16 Conference is rescheduled for 4/23/2019 at 11:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 1/22/2019. (nmk)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Motion from Peter N. Littman, Esq. for John Dalola requesting Adjournment of Civil Case Management Conference submitted to Judge Baxter . (Littman, Peter)
January 17, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Interface Performance Materials, Inc. answer due 1/28/2019. (khr)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Dalola (Littman, Peter)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/20/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/13/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
December 20, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Interface Performance Materials, Inc. (hmr)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Interface Performance Materials, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4597757) filed by John Dalola. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalola v. Interface Performance Materials, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Dalola
Represented By: Peter N. Littman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interface Performance Materials, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?