Barrows et al v. Brinker Restaurant Corporation
Plaintiff: Michael Mendez and Savannah Barrows
Defendant: Brinker Restaurant Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00144
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEF'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT UNTIL APRIL 26, 2019 by Brinker Restaurant Corporation submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Winters, Kristi)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: approving the #11 stipulation. The time for defendant Brinker Restaurant Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 4/12/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 3/28/2019. (nmk)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEF'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT UNTIL APRIL 12, 2019 by Brinker Restaurant Corporation submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Winters, Kristi)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Savannah Barrows, Michael Mendez (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Consent to Join Collective Action Forms)(Murphy, James)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: approving the #8 Stipulation. The time for defendant Brinker Restaurant Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 3/29/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 2/25/2019. (nmk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEF'S TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Brinker Restaurant Corporation submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Winters, Kristi)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristi Rich Winters on behalf of Brinker Restaurant Corporation (Winters, Kristi)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent E. Polsinelli on behalf of Brinker Restaurant Corporation (Polsinelli, Vincent)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Mendez, Savannah Barrows. Brinker Restaurant Corporation served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Murphy, James)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiffs; Attorney Lloyd R. Ambinder. Phone number is (212) 943-9080. Admissions due by 2/19/2019. {Served by mail upon Attorney Ambinder on 2/5/2019}(see)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 5/6/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone, unless the parties are specifically directed to appear, before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 4/29/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brinker Restaurant Corporation. (see)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Brinker Restaurant Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number BNYNDC-4641134) filed by Michael Mendez and Savannah Barrows. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrows et al v. Brinker Restaurant Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mendez
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: James E. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savannah Barrows
Represented By: Frank S. Gattuso
Represented By: James E. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brinker Restaurant Corporation
Represented By: Kristi Rich Winters
Represented By: Vincent E. Polsinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?