Cruz v. Magda et al
Plaintiff: Jorge Cruz
Defendant: Claudiu V. Magda and Trans BN, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv00212
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 TEXT NOTICE of Telephone Conference: A Telephone Status Conference has been set for 7/8/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Defendant counsel is directed to initiate the call and to contact Chambers at (315) 234-8618 (the dedicated conference line) once all counsel are on the line. (sg)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 5/1/2019. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/3/2019. (sg)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Mandatory Disclosures due 4/2/2019. Rule 33 and 34 Requests to be served by 4/22/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 6/28/2019. Mandatory Mediation deadline 8/1/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 8/30/2019. Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Discovery motions due 2/25/2020. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/30/2020. Anticipated length of trial: 10 days, to be held at Syracuse NY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/3/2019. (sg)
April 2, 2019 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Telephone Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/2/2019. Appearances: Rene Juarez, Esq. for Plaintiff; Michael Sullivan, Esq. for Defendants. Defendants to serve Rule 26 Mandatory Disclosures today. Case referred into Mandatory Mediation. Pretrial deadlines are established, a scheduling order and mediation referral order will be issued. (Digitally Recorded)) (sg)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Rene Juarez on behalf of Jorge Cruz (Juarez, Rene)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed letter request (Dkt. No. #12 ) seeking an adjournment of the Rule 16 conference from Attorney Rene Juarez, who represents Plaintiff in this action removed from NYS Court, but is not yet admitted to this Court. Letter request granted. The Telephone Rule 16 conference has been RESCHEDULED for 4/2/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/26/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) It is further ORDERED, that Attorney Cruz is directed to file for reciprocal admission to this Court no later than 3/22/2019, or otherwise obtain admitted counsel to assist in representation of Plaintiff until the admission is completed. The Rule 16 conference will not be further adjourned due to Attorney Juarez's admission status. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/13/2019. (copy of this Text Order served on Attorney Juarez via email.) (sg)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 Letter Motion from Attorney Rene Juarez requesting an adjournment of the March 18, 2019 Rule 16 Conference, since he is in the process of seeking permanent admission submitted to U.S. Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (hmr)
March 11, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Claudiu V. Magda, Trans BN, Inc.. (Scott, Robert)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Attorney Rene Juarez stating that he will be remaining as counsel of record for the Plaintiff in this case - Re: #4 Notice of Admission Requirement. (hmr)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed letter motion (Dkt. No. #8 ) regarding request to submit Exhibit B to Dkt. No. #1 at this time because it was unavailable at the time Dkt. No. #1 was filed. Letter request granted. Dkt. No. [8-1] shall be deemed incorporated as "Exhibit B" to Dkt. No. #1 . Defendants' Counsel is directed to serve a copy of this Text Order and a copy of Dkt. No. #8 upon counsel for Plaintiff by 3/4/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/27/2019. (sg)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 Letter Motion from Robert E. Scott, Esq. for Claudiu V. Magda, Trans BN, Inc. requesting permission to supplement Exhibit B to Dkt. No. 1 submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit B to Dkt. No. 1)(Scott, Robert)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Claudiu V. Magda, Trans BN, Inc.. (Scott, Robert)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Claudiu V. Magda, Trans BN, Inc. re #5 Answer to Complaint (Scott, Robert)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Claudiu V. Magda and Trans BN, Inc..(Scott, Robert) Modified on 2/26/2019 (sg, ).
February 21, 2019 TEXT NOTICE OF ANSWER DEADLINE: ***Answer due 2/22/2019 as to defendants Claudiu V. Magda and Trans BN, Inc. (sg)
February 20, 2019 Dkt. No. 4 - Notice of Admission Requirement was mailed to Attorney Rene Juarez via regular mail on 2/19/2019. (hmr)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Rene Juarez, Phone number is (716) 852-1888. Admissions due by 3/5/2019. (hmr)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/11/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (hmr)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT relating to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Claudiu V. Magda, Trans BN, Inc. (hmr)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Onondaga County Supreme Court, case number 000352/2019 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4652385) filed by Trans BN, Inc., Claudiu V. Magda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Index of Record)(hmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. Magda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Cruz
Represented By: Rene Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudiu V. Magda
Represented By: Robert E. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans BN, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?