Reichard v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Gina M. Reichard
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America and The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv00287
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Referring Judge: David E Peebles
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Kaplan, Anshel)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Letter Request for an extension of time for defendants The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation and The Prudential Insurance Company of America to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint on or before 4/19/2019. Authorized by Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles on 4/2/2019. (sal )
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Motion from Anshel Joel Kaplan for The Prudential Insurance Company of America requesting an extension of Defendants' deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint submitted to Judge David E. Peebles . (Kaplan, Anshel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gina M. Reichard. The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation served on 3/18/2019, answer due 4/8/2019. (Olinsky, Howard)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gina M. Reichard. The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 3/15/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Olinsky, Howard)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation and The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to the Bank of New York Mellon Corporation) (dpk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/10/2019 at 9:30 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/3/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation and The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4666833) filed by Gina M. Reichard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reichard v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Anshel Joel Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: Anshel Joel Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina M. Reichard
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?