DLH Parklawn Apartments, LLC v. Northern Security Insurance Company

Plaintiff: DLH Parklawn Apartments, LLC
Defendant: Vermont Mutual Insurance Company and Northern Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00549
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT DLH Parklawn Apartments, LLC against Northern Security Insurance Company filed by DLH Parklawn Apartments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A Estimate 1, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B Estimate 2, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C Estimate 3, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D Cercone Letter)(Shannon, Kelsey)
June 26, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: In light of the #16 stipulation and order, the telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 7/1/2019 is RESCHEDULED to 8/14/2019 at 11:30 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. Any revisions to the #13 joint Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/7/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/26/2019. (nmk)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER: approving the #15 Stipulation. Defendant Northern Security Insurance Company added. Vermont Mutual Insurance Company terminated. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/26/2019. (nmk)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and Order with Ex. A by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes. (Cercone, Marco)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by DLH Parklawn Apartments, LLC. (Shannon, Kelsey)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by DLH Parklawn Apartments, LLC. (Shannon, Kelsey)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: Approving the #11 Stipulation. The time for defendant Vermont Mutual Insurance Company to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 6/25/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/14/2019. (nmk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION to extend defendant's time to respond to complaint by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company submitted to Judge Baxter. (Cercone, Marco)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: Approving the #9 Stipulation. The time for defendant Vermont Mutual Insurance Company to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 6/14/2019. The joint Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/24/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The telephonic Rule 16 Conference is RESCHEDULED for 7/1/2019 at 11:30 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 5/28/2019. (nmk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #4 Stipulation, 8 Order, Set/Reset Answer Deadline by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company submitted to Judge Baxter. (Cercone, Marco)
May 22, 2019 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: The telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 6/10/2019 is RESCHEDULED IN TIME ONLY to 11:00 AM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Plaintiff's counsel is reminded to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. (nmk)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: approving the #4 Stipulation. The time for defendant Vermont Mutual Insurance Company to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 5/28/2019. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 5/16/2019. (nmk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company re #6 Jury Demand (Cercone, Marco)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company. (Cercone, Marco)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal, General Order 25, and Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal served on Kelsey W. Shannon, Esq. on May 15, 2019, filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company. (Cercone, Marco)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION re Set/Reset Answer Deadline by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company submitted to Judge Baxter. (Cercone, Marco)
May 9, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Vermont Mutual Insurance Company answer due 5/15/2019. (mgh)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 6/10/2019 02:00 PM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 6/3/2019. All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed by DLH Parklawn Apartments, LLC. (mgh)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cortland County Supreme Court, case number EF19-295 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4735565) filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DLH Parklawn Apartments, LLC v. Northern Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLH Parklawn Apartments, LLC
Represented By: Kelsey W. Shannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermont Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Marco Cercone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?