Cannady v. Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust et al
Plaintiff: Steven Cannady
Defendant: Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust and Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Case Number: 5:2019cv00714
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Board of Trustees and Plan on June 19, 2019, filed by Steven Cannady. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Clark, Denise)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust.(Kakazu, Nathan)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan A Kakazu on behalf of All Defendants (Kakazu, Nathan)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER approving #6 Stipulation and granting request for extension of time for Defendants to answer. All defendants' Answer due 7/24/2019. The Court notes that this request was made after the answer deadline had passed. Future requests for extensions of deadlines must be made prior to the expiration of the relevant deadline and must show good cause for the extension request. Plaintiff is directed to file affidavits of service by 7/19/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 7/12/2019. (sg)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (Blask, Jordan)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathan Kakazu, Esq. for defendants. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 7/11/2019. (sg)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathan A. Kakazu Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4795307. filed by Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust, Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Admission to Practice, #2 Declaration of Sponsor, #3 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #4 Certificate of Good Standing) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Blask, Jordan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/17/2019 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/10/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust and Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust)(see)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust and Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4772659) filed by Steven Cannady. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cannady v. Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Represented By: Jordan S. Blask
Represented By: Nathan A Kakazu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust
Represented By: Jordan S. Blask
Represented By: Nathan A Kakazu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Cannady
Represented By: Denise M Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?