Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 5:2019cv00728
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Norman A Mordue
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: granting #6 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 7/9/2019. (nmk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) C, #6 Proposed Order/Judgment) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (James, Jacqueline)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: granting #4 Plaintiff's Letter Request for permission to file a Motion seeking Leave to File a Third Party Subpoena pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) and adjourn without date an Initial Rule 16 Conference until the defendant in this action is named and served. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 7/8/2019. (nmk)
July 4, 2019 Filing 4 Letter Motion from Jacqueline M. James for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC requesting Leave to File a Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Adjourn Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference submitted to Judge Baxter . (James, Jacqueline)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (James, Jacqueline)
June 20, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue a summons for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against this defendant, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identity. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendant, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendant pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (meb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright. (Sent to Register of Copyrights via regular mail.) (meb)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WTH JURY DEMAND against John Doe (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4776277) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(meb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?