Bullard v. Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jan Bullard
Defendant: Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv00747
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
2 Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Jan Bullard (Fraietta, Philip)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER approving #10 Stipulation and granting request for extension of time for defendant to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint. Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company answer to amended complaint (Dkt. No. #7 ) due 9/6/2019. The telephone Rule 16 Conference and the associated court ordered deadlines remain as set in General Order 25 (Dkt. No. #3 ). SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 7/15/2019. (sg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION [JOINT] FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company submitted to Judge Gary L. Sharpe. (O'Driscoll, Timothy)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. O'Driscoll on behalf of Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (O'Driscoll, Timothy)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby recused. Case RANDOMLY reassigned to Senior Judge Gary L. Sharpe for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 7/2/19. (lmw)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company filed by Jan Bullard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Fraietta, Philip)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER TO STRIKE #5 Notice of Exhibit A to Complaint: Defendant filed a Complaint (Dkt. No. #1 ) which references Exhibit A, however, the Exhibit was not attached to the original filing. Court has reviewed Dkt. No. #5 which appears to be the Exhibit to the complaint. However, Plaintiff must file a complete pleading on the docket, which will be the operative pleading. Therefore, Dkt. No. #5 will be stricken and not considered by the Court. Plaintiff is ordered to file an Amended Complaint, a complete pleading with all necessary exhibits and/or attachments, by 7/1/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 6/24/2019. (sg)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 **STRICKEN pursuant to the 6/24/2019 Text Order of Magistrate Judge Dancks***NOTICE by Jan Bullard re #1 Complaint Exhibit A to Complaint (Fraietta, Philip) Modified on 6/24/2019 (sg, ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Jan Bullard; Attorney Frederick J. Klorczyk III. Phone number is (925) 300-4455. Admissions due by 7/5/2019. {Mailed to Attorney on 6/21/2019}(see)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 9/19/2019 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/12/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company. (see)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number BNYNDC-4777814) filed by Jan Bullard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bullard v. Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwestern Mutual Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy J. O'Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan Bullard
Represented By: Philip Lawrence Fraietta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?