Teal's Express, Inc. et al v. Munk et al
Plaintiff: Teal's Express, Inc. and Teal's Express, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan
Defendant: Christine Munk and Pershing LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv00761
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE returned executed by Christine Munk. (see)
August 13, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: re #10 Stipulation. the time for defendant Pershing LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 8/30/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 8/13/2019. [Copy served upon pro se defendant via regular mail.] (nmk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE mailed to Christine Munk on 8/12/2019 via regular mail. [Package contained two copies of the pro se notice and pro se packet.] (hmr)
August 12, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim: Clerk deleted attachment 1 - cover letter that was originally file, since it was the incorrect document and did not belong in this case. Clerk added Attachment four - Cover Letter which is the correct document. (hmr)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Teal's Express, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan, Teal's Express, Inc. by Christine Munk. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(hmr) Modified on 8/13/2019 to reflect that there are no crossclaims. (nmk)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Teal's Express, Inc., Teal's Express, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan by Christine Munk. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Envelope)(hmr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2019: #4 Cover Letter) (hmr, ).
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant Munk to Respond to Complaint by Teal's Express, Inc., Teal's Express, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Galbato, Suzanne)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER: The time for defendants Christine Munk and Pershing LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 8/12/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 7/23/2019. (nmk)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Defendant Munk to Respond to Complaint by Teal's Express, Inc., Teal's Express, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Galbato, Suzanne)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Teal's Express, Inc., Teal's Express, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan submitted to Judge Baxter. (Galbato, Suzanne)
July 10, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Christine Munk - answer due 7/23/2019; answer for Pershing LLC due 7/22/2019. (rep)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Pershing LLC on 07/01/2019, filed by Teal's Express, Inc.. (Galbato, Suzanne)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Pershing LLC on 06/28/2019, filed by Teal's Express, Inc.. (Galbato, Suzanne)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Christine Munk on 07/02/2019, filed by Teal's Express, Inc.. (Galbato, Suzanne)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter by telephone. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 9/18/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (rep)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Christine Munk and Pershing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Pershing LLC)(rep)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT: Against Christine Munk and Pershing LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4782950), filed by Teal's Express, Inc. and 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan, Teal's Express, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teal's Express, Inc. et al v. Munk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Munk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pershing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teal's Express, Inc.
Represented By: Suzanne O. Galbato
Represented By: Kseniya Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teal's Express, Inc. 401(K) Profit Sharing Plan
Represented By: Suzanne O. Galbato
Represented By: Kseniya Premo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?