Manes v. Onondaga County et al
Plaintiff: Sidney Manes
Defendant: Dr. Erik Mitchell, John Does 1-10, City of Syracuse, William Fitzpatrick and Onondaga County
Case Number: 5:2019cv00844
Filed: July 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed letter motions (Dkt. Nos. #17 and #18 ) and grants in part and denies in part both requests as follows: all parties including the City shall respond to the amended complaint by 9/30/2019; the motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. #7 ) is denied as moot since an amended complaint (Dkt. No. #16 ) has been filed. The Rule 16 and related deadlines continue to be adjourned and will be reset as necessary after all parties have responded to the amended complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Brenda K. Sannes on 4/30/2019. (rjb, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 18 Letter Motion from Mary L. D'Agostino, Esq. for City of Syracuse requesting an extension of time to respond to the amended complaint submitted to Judge Brenda K. Sannes . (D'Agostino, Mary)
August 28, 2019 Filing 17 Letter Motion from Ameer Benno for Sidney Manes requesting termination of City of Syracuse's Rule 12(b)(6) motion and resetting of Rule 16 conference and related deadlines, or alternatively adjournment sine die of due date for plaintiff's opposition papers submitted to Judge Sannes . (Benno, Ameer)
August 27, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Sidney Manes.(Benno, Ameer)
August 22, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Erik Mitchell answer due 9/3/2019; Onondaga County answer due 8/29/2019. (see)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on County of Onondaga on 8/8/19, filed by Sidney Manes. (Benno, Ameer)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Dr. Erik Mitchell on 8/12/19, filed by Sidney Manes. (Benno, Ameer)
August 21, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on William Fitzpatrick via regular postal depository on 8/9/19, filed by Sidney Manes. (Benno, Ameer)
August 21, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Julian on behalf of William Fitzpatrick, Erik Mitchell (Julian, Robert)
August 19, 2019 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re #10 Affidavit of Service. The affidavit of service is as to City of Syracuse. Clerk removed in docket text that it is as to County of Onondaga. It is a duplicate entry of document no. 11. Counsel should re-file the affidavit of service as to County of Onondaga. (see)
August 19, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for City of Syracuse answer due 8/29/2019. (see)
August 16, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on City of Syracuse on 8/8/19, filed by Sidney Manes. (Benno, Ameer)
August 16, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on City of Syracuse on 8/8/19, filed by Sidney Manes. (Benno, Ameer) Modified on 8/19/2019 (see, ).
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER : Court reviewed letter motion (Dkt. No. #8 ) for an adjournment of the Rule 16 conference and related deadlines, which is granted for the reason stated. The Rule 16 conference and related deadlines will be reset as necessary in the future. In addition, the Court notes that no appearances have been made by defendants Fitzpatrick and Mitchell, and no affidavits of service have been filed regarding service on any of the defendants. Therefore, plaintiff is directed to file affidavits of service for any defendant that has been served by 8/26/2019, along with a status report regarding service on any defendant that is not yet completed. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/16/2019. (sg)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 Letter Motion from Mary L. D'Agostino for City of Syracuse requesting adjournment of the Rule 16 conference submitted to Judge Dancks . (D'Agostino, Mary)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2019 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Judge Brenda K. Sannes Response to Motion due by 9/3/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/9/2019. filed by City of Syracuse. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #5 Memorandum of Law) (D'Agostino, Mary)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina F. DeJoseph on behalf of City of Syracuse (DeJoseph, Christina)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary L. D'Agostino on behalf of City of Syracuse (D'Agostino, Mary)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John E. Heisler, Jr on behalf of Onondaga County (Heisler, John)
July 16, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Does 1-10 in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendants at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (see)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/15/2019 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/8/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see)
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to City of Syracuse, William Fitzpatrick, Erik Mitchell, and Onondaga County. (Attachments: #1 Summons for the City of Syracuse, #2 Summons for William Fitzpatrick, #3 Summons for Dr. Erik Mitchell)(see)
July 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against City of Syracuse, John Does 1-10, William Fitzpatrick, Erik Mitchell, and Onondaga County (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4797851) filed by Sidney Manes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manes v. Onondaga County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Erik Mitchell
Represented By: Robert F. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Syracuse
Represented By: Mary L. D'Agostino
Represented By: Christina F. DeJoseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Fitzpatrick
Represented By: Robert F. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onondaga County
Represented By: John E. Heisler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Manes
Represented By: Ameer N. Benno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?