Ireland v. The Hartford et al
Plaintiff: Margaret M. Ireland
Defendant: The Hartford and National Grid
Case Number: 5:2019cv00929
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Margaret M. Ireland. The Hartford waiver sent on 9/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (Wicklund, Edward)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Margaret M. Ireland. National Grid served on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Wicklund, Edward)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: approving the #6 Stipulation. The time for defendant National Grid to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 10/7/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 9/9/2019. (nmk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION & Order by National Grid submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(LaBerge, Robert)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. LaBerge on behalf of National Grid (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(LaBerge, Robert)
August 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick W. Begos on behalf of The Hartford (Begos, Patrick)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 10/30/2019 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 10/23/2019. All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mgh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Grid, The Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to National Grid)(mgh)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Grid, The Hartford (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4815983) filed by Margaret M. Ireland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mgh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ireland v. The Hartford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford
Represented By: Patrick W. Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Grid
Represented By: Robert A. LaBerge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret M. Ireland
Represented By: Edward A. Wicklund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?