Fournier et al v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: V.G., Jr. and Marissa A. Fournier
Defendant: Police Officer C. Lambertson, Onondaga County Justice Center, Judge Karen Uplinger, Correction Officers Jane Does and John Does 1 through 100, Detective Abrams, City of Syracuse Police Department, Police Officers Jane Does and John Does 1 through 100, P.O. Taylor Anderson, Onondaga County District Attorney's Office and Frank L. Fowler
Case Number: 5:2019cv00930
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Frederick J Scullin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DISMISSING CASE for failure to prosecute with prejudice... Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 11/26/2019. (bjw, )
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed letter motion (Dkt. No. #9 ) which is denied without prejudice in light of the Courts Order at Dkt. No. #14 . SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/21/2019. (sg)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that this case is hereby placed on the Court's 11/22/2019 Dismissal Calendar as a result of Plaintiffs' failure to comply with Court orders. Plaintiff must file a response by 10/25/2019 to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute.. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr on 10/18/2019. (bjw, )
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER TO STRIKE: Court has reviewed letter motions (Dkt. Nos. #10 and #11 ) from Plaintiff which reference the docket number for this matter. However, the subject matter and parties referenced do not pertain to this matter. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to strike Dkt. Nos. #10 and #11 , and return any documents for which sealing is requested to the Plaintiff. Additionally, Plaintiff is represented by an attorney in this matter and therefore only the attorney is permitted to file documents on behalf of Plaintiffs. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/17/2019. (Copy of this Text Order, and copies of filings made at Dkt. 10 and Dkt. 11 served on Plaintiff. )(sg)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 ***SEALED DOCUMENT SUPPORTING EXHIBITS: filed by Marissa A. Fournier, Pro Se. (jmb)
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 ***STRICKEN pursuant to the 10/17/2019 Text Order of Magistrate Judge Dancks***SEALED MOTION filed by Marissa A. Fournier to Seal Supporting Exhibits. (jmb) Modified on 10/18/2019 (sg, ).
October 17, 2019 Filing 10 **STRICKEN pursuant to the 10/17/2019 Text Order of Magistrate Judge Dancks***Letter Motion dated 10/16/2019 filed by Marissa A. Fournier, Pro Se requesting that the Court support her request for a written apology from the School District, submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (jmb) Modified on 10/18/2019 (sg, ).
September 26, 2019 Filing 9 Letter Motion from Todd M. Long for City of Syracuse Police Department requesting apprising the Court of Plaintiffs' failure to comply with the Court's ordered deadline to file a complaint and proposed summonses as directed in Dkt. No. 4, and requesting that Your Honor report and recommend administrative closure of this case submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks . (Long, Todd)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed defendant City's status report (Dkt. No. #6 ) and plaintiffs' request for extension of time (Dkt. No. #7 ) to file a complaint and proposed summonses as directed in Dkt. No. 4 . Plaintiffs' letter request granted. Although Plaintiffs' request is untimely since it is submitted after the previous due date expired, the Court will afford Plaintiffs a final opportunity to comply. Plaintiffs are directed to file a complaint by 9/25/2019 and attach proposed summonses for all defendants who have not yet been served. No further extensions will be granted. Plaintiffs' failure to comply may result in an administrative closure of this case. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/28/2019. (sg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Angel A. Castro, III, Esq. for Marissa A. Fournier requesting Enlargement of Time submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks . (Castro, Angel)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT regarding Plaintiffs' compliance with the Court's Order (Dkt. No. 4) by City of Syracuse Police Department. (Long, Todd)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Leigh A. Lieberman on behalf of City of Syracuse Police Department (Lieberman, Leigh)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed the docket and the letter motion filed by defendant City of Syracuse Police Department (Dkt. No. #3 ). Court grants Defendant's request insofar as the R. 16 Conference currently scheduled for 9/3/2019 and the associated deadlines are adjourned without new date at this time. Plaintiff is directed to file the complaint by 8/23/2019 and attach proposed summonses for all defendants who have not yet been served. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/5/2019. (sg)
August 5, 2019 Filing 3 Letter Motion from Todd M. Long for City of Syracuse Police Department requesting adjournment to G.O. 25 Filing Order submitted to Judge Frederick J. Scullin, Jr. Senior U.S. District Court Judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - July 30, 2019 Demand for a Complaint, pursuant to N.D.N.Y. Local Rule 5.1(h), with a certificate of service)(Long, Todd)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Telephone Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 8/27/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jmb)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL: from NYS Supreme Court, County of Onondaga, case number 003499-2019 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4816205) filed by Todd M. Long, Esq., on behalf of City of Syracuse Police Department. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons with Notice, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Appearance, #3 Exhibit C - Demand for Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing of Removal, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(jmb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fournier et al v. Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer C. Lambertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onondaga County Justice Center
Represented By: John E. Heisler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Karen Uplinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correction Officers Jane Does and John Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Syracuse Police Department
Represented By: Leigh A. Lieberman
Represented By: Todd M. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officers Jane Does and John Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.O. Taylor Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Onondaga County District Attorney's Office
Represented By: John E. Heisler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank L. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.G., Jr.
Represented By: Angel A. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marissa A. Fournier
Represented By: Angel A. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?