United States of America v. Lancor et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Marion Lancor, XYZ Corporation, Marion B. Lancor, Northern Federal Credit Union, John Doe, Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. and Mary Roe
Case Number: 5:2019cv00936
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: Court reviewed Dkt. No. #7 . If defendant Lancor does not respond to the complaint or otherwise appear in this action by 10/4/2019, Plaintiff should file request for Clerk's Entry of Default thereafter regarding all defendants, if appropriate. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/17/2019. (sg)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by United States of America. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Marion Lancor served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (LaBletta, Nicole)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed the docket and notes that answer deadlines as to defendants Capital One Bank and Northern Federal Credit Union have passed, with no answer filed or appearance made on behalf of either defendant. Court also notes no affidavit of service has yet been filed as to defendant Lancor. Plaintiff to file status report re: any communications plaintiff has had with defendants Capital One Bank and Northern Federal Credit Union or request for entry of default as to those two defendants by 9/20/2019. Plaintiff to include in that status report the status of service on defendant Lancor. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/11/2019. (sg)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. served on 8/7/2019, answer due 8/28/2019; Northern Federal Credit Union served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. (LaBletta, Nicole)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by United States of America (LaBletta, Nicole)
August 1, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named John Doe, Mary roe, and XYZ Corporation in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against these defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (see)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Marion Lancor, and Northern Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Northern Federal Credit Union, #2 Summons for Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.)(see)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Action to Foreclose a Mortgage against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., John Doe, Marion Lancor, Northern Federal Credit Union, Mary Roe, XYZ Corporation filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(see)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lancor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion Lancor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marion B. Lancor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nicole B. LaBletta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?