Williams et al v. The City of Syracuse et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Chrysler and Kyle Williams
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER LIADKA, Gregory DiPuccio and The City of Syracuse
Case Number: 5:2019cv00995
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Gary L Sharpe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Gregory DiPuccio, Liadka, The City of Syracuse.(DeJoseph, Christina)
August 29, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Gregory DiPuccio answer due 9/5/2019; Liadka answer due 9/5/2019; The City of Syracuse answer due 9/5/2019. (khr)
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on The City of Syracuse on 8/15/2019, filed by Rachel Chrysler, Kyle Williams. (Lichtmacher, Fred)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on PO Gregory DePuccio on 8/15/2019, filed by Rachel Chrysler, Kyle Williams. (Lichtmacher, Fred)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on PO Liadka on 8/15/2019, filed by Rachel Chrysler, Kyle Williams. (Lichtmacher, Fred)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Syracuse before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/5/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jel, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gregory DiPuccio, POLICE OFFICER LIADKA, The City of Syracuse. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued to Police Officer Gregory DiPuccio, #2 Summons Issued to Police Office Liadka)(jel, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gregory DiPuccio, POLICE OFFICER LIADKA, The City of Syracuse (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4833398) filed by Kyle Williams, Rachel Chrysler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al v. The City of Syracuse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Chrysler
Represented By: Fred B. Lichtmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Williams
Represented By: Fred B. Lichtmacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER LIADKA
Represented By: Christina F. DeJoseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory DiPuccio
Represented By: Christina F. DeJoseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Syracuse
Represented By: Christina F. DeJoseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?