Doran v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Wayne A Doran
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 5:2019cv01126
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Miroslav Lovric
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER: Counsel have already been directed by Magistrate Judge Baxter in the Phillips case to meet and confer and submit a status report by 11/15/2019. This Court directs counsel to include in that status report their views as to this Doran case as well. Counsel are also directed to file the 11/15/2019 status report in this Doran case in addition to filing it before Judge Baxter in the Phillips case. Counsel should also review the documents sent to NDNY from the MDL as filed in the docket of this Doran case and notify the court clerk whether all of the orders and pleadings designated in the MDL should be carried over to the docket in this Doran case. The parties should also make certain that the Master Complaint is filed in this Doran docket and should coordinate with the clerk to accomplish such. After this Court receives the 11/15/2019 status report, the Court will issue a G.O. 25 Order and schedule an In Person Rule 16 initial conference before the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 11/4/2019. (jdp, )
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: Telephone Conference held on 10/31/2019 with the Parties; APP: L. Baughman, Esq. for the Plaintiff and V. Quinn, Esq. and J. Rogers, Esq. for the Defendants. Counsel advise that attorneys on both sides were involved with the MDL proceedings and have a common inventory of many remanded cases, and at least two in the Northern District of New York. Both Counsel have also appeared in Phillips v. C R Bard Incorporated et al, 5:19-cv-01134-LEK-ATB, pending before Magistrate Judge Andrew Baxter. The parties will confer and consider whether they will request consolidation or coordination of pretrial proceedings in this Doran case and in the Phillips case, 5:19-cv-01134 (LEK/ATB). Counsel should also review the documents sent to NDNY from the MDL as filed in the docket of this Doran case and notify the court clerk whether all of the orders and pleadings designated in the MDL should be carried over to the docket in this case. The parties should also make certain that the Master Complaint is filed in this Doran docket and should coordinate with the clerk to accomplish such. The parties agree that this case may proceed on the prior pleadings, including a short-form complaint and a master complaint developed in the MDL. Counsel have already been directed by Magistrate Judge Baxter in the Phillips case to meet and confer and submit a status report by 11/15/2019. This Court directs counsel to include in that status report their views as to this Doran case as well. Counsel should file the 11/15/2019 status report in this Doran case in addition to filing it before Magistrate Judge Baxter. After this Court receives the 11/15/2019 status report, the Court will issue a G.O. 25 Order and schedule an In Person Rule 16 initial conference before the Court. (jdp, )
October 23, 2019 Set Hearings: A Telephone Conference is set for 10/31/2019 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Plaintiff's Counsel is directed to initiate the call to chambers, which can be reached at 607-779-2628. (jdp )
October 22, 2019 Filing 23 STATUS REPORT on joint availability for tele conf by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Quinn, Vivian)
October 18, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: In light of the a Notice of Appearance filed by the Plaintiff; the Courts would like to schedule a Telephone Conference with the Counselors on record. Please advise the Court by 10/23/2019 by submitting a JOINT letter with a date and time that works best for counsel. Please chose from the following: 10/29/2019 any where between 10:15 AM to 11:30 AM, 10/31/2019 between 2:00 Pm and 4:00 PM and 11/4/2019 anytime after 11:00 AM. (jdp)
October 17, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura J Baughman on behalf of Wayne A Doran (Baughman, Laura)
October 16, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Wayne A. Doran; Attorney Thomas William Arbon, Email address is tarbon@bencmartin.com. Phone number is214-761-6614. Admissions due by 10/30/2019. (jdp, ) Modified on 10/17/2019 (see) - Sent via regular mail on 10/16/2019.
October 16, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Wayne A.Boran; Attorney Ben C. MArtin, Email address is bmartin@martinbaughman.com. Phone number is 214-761-6614. Admissions due by 10/30/2019. (jdp )
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Rogers on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Rogers, James)
October 1, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk reached out to Plaintiff's last known Attorney on #1 Complaint via email to ask for a last known address to send 18 Text Order on 9/30/2019. To date, Clerk has not received a response back. (jdp )
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a status within 5 days of this order, if they intend to proceed as Pro Se or if Counsel will be representing them. If the Plaintiff intends to have an Attorney represent them in this matter, please inform the Court as to the name, address, phone number and email of the Attorney. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/30/2019. (jdp )
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Directing Attorney James F. Rogers, Esq. to file a Notice of Appearance within 5 days from todays order, if he intends to represent the Defendants in this matter.SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/30/2019. (jdp )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/23/2019. (jdp, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of James F. Rogers Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4877792. filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Vivian M. Quinn, #2 Petition for Admission to Practice, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 New Attorney E-Filing Registration Form, #5 Certificate of Service) Motions referred to Miroslav Lovric. (Quinn, Vivian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Becton, Dickinson and Company for Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Quinn, Vivian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated re #10 Notice of Appearance (Quinn, Vivian)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated re #11 Notice of Appearance (Scarpello, Tracey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Scarpello, Tracey)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Vivian M. Quinn on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Quinn, Vivian)
September 17, 2019 Filing 9 Letter of Richard B. North, Jr., dated 9/17/2019 advising he will not be representing defendants in this action. (re #8 Notice of Admission Requirement) (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Defendant; Attorney Richard B. North, Jr., Esq., Email address is richard.north@nelsonmullins.com. Phone number is 404-322-6000. Admissions due by 9/26/2019. (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff; Attorney Thomas William Arbon, Esq., Email address is tarbon@bencmartin.com. Phone number is 214-761-6614. Admissions due by 9/26/2019. (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Plaintiff; Attorney Ben C. Martin, Esq., Email address is bmartin@martinbaughman.com. Phone number is 214-761-6614. Admissions due by 9/26/2019. (plp)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-00823. electronically transferred when case opened
September 10, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to Northern District of New York via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-823-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]
March 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15261575 filed by Wayne A Doran. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doran v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Vivian M. Quinn
Represented By: James F. Rogers
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne A Doran
Represented By: Laura J Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?