Powers-Barnhard v. Butler et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Powers-Barnhard
Defendant: GLV, Inc., Rick Butler, U.S.A. Volleyball and Cheryl Butler
Case Number: 5:2019cv01208
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Cheryl Butler answer due 12/2/2019; Rick Butler answer due 12/2/2019; GLV, Inc. answer due 12/2/2019. (pjh)
November 8, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice Regarding Availabiltiy of Electronic Filing Supreme Court Cases; Summons and Verified Complaint served on Rick Butler, Cheryl Butler, GLV, Inc. d/b/a Sports Performance Volleyball Club and Great Lakes Center, U.S.A. Volleyball on 11/7/19, 11/7/19, 11/7/19, 8/28/19, filed by Sarah Powers-Barnhard. (Merson, Jordan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Merson on behalf of Sarah Powers-Barnhard (Merson, Jordan)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: granting #15 Letter Request. The time for defendant U.S.A. Volleyball to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 12/4/2019. A joint Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/10/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) The telephonic Rule 16 Conference set for 11/12/2019 is RESCHEDULED to 12/17/2019 at 02:30 PM before U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the call and contact chambers at 315-234-8600 when all participants are on the conference line. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/1/2019. (nmk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 Letter Motion from Dean J. DiPilato for U.S.A. Volleyball requesting thirty (30) day extension to respond to Complaint and new date for Rule 16 Conference submitted to Judge Hon. Andrew Baxter . (DiPilato, Dean)
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER: approving #13 substitution of attorney. Mackenzie Hughes LLP is substituted as counsel of record for USA Volleyball in place of Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/21/2019. (nmk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by U.S.A. Volleyball / Proposed Consent Order Granting Substitution Of Attorney (Alfieri, Vincent)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 Letter from Jordan K. Merson in response to #5 Notice of Admission Requirement advising Court that he will remain attorney of record and is in the process of being admitted to the Northern District. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pjh)
October 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lorraine M. Mertell on behalf of U.S.A. Volleyball (Mertell, Lorraine)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean J. DiPilato on behalf of U.S.A. Volleyball (DiPilato, Dean)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen T. Helmer on behalf of U.S.A. Volleyball (Helmer, Stephen)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: granting #7 Letter Request. The time for defendant U.S.A. Volleyball to answer or respond to the complaint is extended to 11/4/2019. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/7/2019. (nmk)
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Letter Motion from Daniel P. Waxman for U.S.A. Volleyball requesting Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter . (Alfieri, Vincent)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal, General Order #25, Case Management Plan, Case Assignment/Motion Schedules, and filing Locations, and Consent to Proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge served on Jordan K. Merson, Attorneys for Plaintiff, and Danielle D'Ambrose, Attorneys for Butler and GLV Defendants on 9/30/2019, filed by U.S.A. Volleyball. (Alfieri, Vincent)
September 30, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Cheryl Butler answer due 10/4/2019; Rick Butler answer due 10/4/2019; GLV, Inc. answer due 10/4/2019; U.S.A. Volleyball answer due 10/4/2019. (pjh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Admission Requirement; Attorney Jordan K. Merson, attorney for Plaintiff Sarah Powers-Barnhard. Email address is jmerson@mersonlaw.com. Phone number is 212-603-9100. Admissions due by 10/11/2019. (pjh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement; Attorney Danielle D'Ambrose, attorney for Defendants Rick Butler, Cheryl Butler, and GLV, Inc, d/b/a Sports Performance Volleyball Club and Great Lakes Center. Email address is danielle@dambrosepc.com. Phone number is 312-396-4121. Admissions due by 10/11/2019. (pjh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 11/12/2019 11:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/5/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT from Onondaga County Supreme Court, case number 007595/19. (pjh)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Onondaga County Supreme Court, case number 007595/19 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4886320) filed by USA Volleyball.(Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Consent to Removal)(pjh) Modified on 9/30/2019 to correct filer (pjh). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/30/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (pjh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Powers-Barnhard v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.A. Volleyball
Represented By: Vincent Alfieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Powers-Barnhard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?