Jackson v. General Motors et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Jackson
Defendant: Rick E. Hansen, General Motors, GM Motors, Inc. and General Motors Corporation
Case Number: 5:2019cv01276
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 Letter Motion from Jeffrey S. Jackson requesting that the Court place his medical records under seal submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (pjh)
November 14, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Jeffrey S. Jackson re #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Response to Motion due by 12/3/2019. Motion Hearing is set for 12/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Albany before Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn. As a reminder, all motions are considered on the submission of the papers, only. No personal appearances are required. No oral arguments will be entertained.***A copy of this Notice was served upon pro se party via US Mail. (sas)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Jeffrey S. Jackson regarding the #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (pjh)
November 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeffrey S. Jackson. Motions referred to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (pjh)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Jeffrey S. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10 - Search Summary State of Michigan Corporations Division) (pjh)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs #2 motion to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED, and it is further ORDERED that on or before December 2, 2019, Plaintiffs shall pay the $400.00 filing fee to proceed with this case; and it is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs failure to comply with the terms of this Order may result in an administrative closure of this case, or dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute and failure to obey a Court Order; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk provide Plaintiff a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/1/2019. {Clerk served copy upon Pro Se Plaintiff via regular mail}(pjh)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against GM Motors, Inc. and General Motors Corporation filed by Jeffrey S. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Vehicle Recalls, #2 Exhibit 2 - Vehicle Recalls contiuned, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email From Greg Coleman Law, P.C., #4 Exhibit 4 - Geico Claim Documents, #5 Exhibit 5 - Vehicle Registration Application and Invoices, #6 Exhibit 6 - Police Accident Report, #7 Exhibit 7 - Abstract of Driving Record, #8 Exhibit 8 - Correspondence with General Motors, #9 Exhibit 9 - Search Summary State of Michigan Corporations Division)(pjh)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Request/ Motion from Jeffrey Jackson requesting General Motors, LLC and GM Motors, Inc. be added to the docket as Defendants submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. {Clerk notes that GM Motors, Inc. is already listed as a party in this case with a different address} (pjh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against GM Motors, Inc. and General Motors Corporation filed by Jeffrey S. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to GM Motors, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons as to General Motors Corporation)(pjh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained at the time the complaint was filed. (pjh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 Letter Motion from Jeffrey S. Jackson, Pro Se requesting General Motors Company be added to the docket as a defendant. Submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (pjh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey S. Jackson Effective Date 10/17/2019 Old Address: P.O. Box 3174, Liverpool. NY 13090 New Address: P.O. Box 3174, Liverpool, NY 13089 (pjh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeffrey S. Jackson, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to General Motors, Albany, NY, #2 Proposed Summons as to General Motors, New York, NY, #3 Proposed Summons as to General Motors, Detroit, MI, #4 Proposed Summons as to General Motors - Corporate Counsel) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (pjh)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors and Rick E. Hansen filed by Jeffrey S. Jackson, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. General Motors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick E. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GM Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?