Jackson v. Alcon Labratories et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Jackson
Defendant: Royce Bedward, Alcon Labratories, Alcon Cares, Inc., Alcon Vision, LLC and Alcon Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv01277
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew T Baxter
Referring Judge: Lawrence E Kahn
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Alcon Cares, Inc., Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Vision, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Alcon Labratories, Inc., #2 Summons Issued as to Alcon Vision, LLC) (dpk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: denying #17 Plaintiff's request to seal medical records in this case as premature. Upon review, plaintiff has not submitted any medical records in support of this case. In the event that plaintiff submits medical records in the future, plaintiff is directed to review Local Rule 8.1 before submitting any medical records. If, after review of the local rules, plaintiff still wants to request that medical information be filed under seal, plaintiff shall file a proper motion to seal pursuant to Local Rule 83.13. Plaintiff should refrain from submitting any more materials until the complaint is served and the defendants have the opportunity to respond. There is no reason for plaintiff to submit any other materials at this time. Making premature and unnecessary submissions only serves to delay the action. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/18/2019. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk)
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER: The clerk is directed to reissue summonses as to defendants Alcon Cares, Inc., Alcon Laboratories, Inc., and Alcon Vision, LLC, using the addresses provided in #15 , #16 plaintiff's proposed summonses. #16 Plaintiff's request to add Alcon Research, LLC as a defendant in this action is denied, without prejudice. If plaintiff is seeking to amend his complaint, he shall follow Fed. R. Civ. P. 15, as well as the Local Rules, as to filing a motion to amend. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/18/2019. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk)
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 Letter Motion from Jeffrey S. Jackson, requesting to seal medical records. (see)
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 Letter Motion from Jeffrey S. Jackson, requesting to add deft Alcon Research, LLC. Submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Alcon Research LLC, #2 Proposed Summons Alcon Vision, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons Alcon Cares, Inc.)(see)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 Letter Motion from Jeffrey S. Jackson, requesting to add Alcon Laboratories, Inc. Submitted to Judge Andrew T. Baxter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Alcon Labratories Inc.)(see)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff has submitted multiple addresses for the defendants named in the #7 amended complaint. Plaintiff is directed to submit correct addresses where defendants are to be served by 11/18/2019. Summonses will not be issued in this case until plaintiff has provided one address per defendant for service. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/4/2019. [Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail.] (nmk)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED for purposes of initial review, subject to the #10 Order. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 11/4/2019. (nmk)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Alcon Cares, Inc., Alcon Laboratories, Inc. and Alcon Vision, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Alcon Vision LLC, #2 Summon Issued as to Alcon Cares Inc.) (dpk)
October 30, 2019 Filing 11 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Syracuse before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. All conferences will be conducted by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear. Counsel for the plaintiff is directed to coordinate the initial conference call. Once all parties are on the conference line, Judge Baxter's chambers can be reached at 315-234-8600. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/21/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk)
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 DECISION and ORDER. Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue summonses and forward them, along with copies of the amended complaint, and a packet containing General Order 25, which sets forth the Civil Case Management Plan used by the Northern District of New York to the United States Marshal for service upon the defendants Alcon Cares, Inc., Alcon Laboratories, Inc., and Alcon Vision, LLC. It is further ORDERED that a response to plaintiff's complaint be filed by the named defendants or their counsel as provided for in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; and it is ORDERED, that the Clerk is directed to schedule a Rule 16 conference before me. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/29/2019. (Motions #4 Letter Request, #5 Letter Request, #6 Letter Request, #8 Letter Request terminated.) (Copy served via regular mail.) (dpk)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 Letter Motion from Jeffrey Jackson requesting that parties Alcon Vision, LLC and Alcon Inc be added as defendants in this action. (dpk)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alcon Labratories, Alcon Cares, Inc. and Alcon Vision, LLC filed by Jeffrey S. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons as to Alcon Cares, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons as to Alcon Laboratories, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons as to Alcon Vision, LLC) (dpk)
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE issued and explained at the time the complaint was filed. (pjh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 Letter Motion from Jeffrey S. Jackson requesting that party Alcon Vision, LLC be added as a defendant in this action. (dpk)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 Letter Motion from Jeffrey S. Jackson requesting that party Alcon Laboratories, Inc. be added as a defendant in this action. (dpk)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 Letter Motion from Jeffrey S. Jackson requesting to add defendant Alcon Cares, Inc. as a defendant in this action submitted to Judge Baxter. (dpk)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jeffrey S. Jackson for the zip code only (13090 to 13089) (dpk)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jeffrey S. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Royce Bedward, #2 Proposed Summons as to Alcon Labratories) Motions referred to Andrew T. Baxter. (dpk)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alcon Labratories and Royce Bedward filed by Jeffrey S. Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dpk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Alcon Labratories et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royce Bedward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcon Labratories
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcon Cares, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcon Vision, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcon Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?