Jackson v. STF Services Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Jackson
Defendant: JOHN DOE, Bloomberg L.P., Bloomberg Industry Group, STF Services Corp. and Bloomberg BNA
Case Number: 5:2019cv01326
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Glenn T Suddaby
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Bloomberg BNA, Bloomberg Industry Group re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim And to Enjoin Plaintiff From Bringing Further Duplicative Actions (Defendant's Request For Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Freeman, Scarlett)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim And to Enjoin Plaintiff From Bringing Further Duplicative Actions (Declaration of Demedre R. Heulett) filed by Bloomberg BNA, Bloomberg Industry Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I)(Freeman, Scarlett)
November 1, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, (Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss) filed by Bloomberg BNA, Bloomberg Industry Group. (Freeman, Scarlett)
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Bloomberg BNA, Bloomberg Industry Group re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim And to Enjoin Plaintiff From Bringing Further Duplicative Actions (Notice to Pro Se Plaintiff of The Consequences of Failing to Respond to a Dispositive Motion) (Freeman, Scarlett)
November 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Bloomberg BNA, Bloomberg Industry Group re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim And to Enjoin Plaintiff From Bringing Further Duplicative Actions (Defendant's Request For Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Freeman, Scarlett)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim And to Enjoin Plaintiff From Bringing Further Duplicative Actions (Declaration of Demedre R. Heulett) filed by Bloomberg BNA, Bloomberg Industry Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I)(Freeman, Scarlett)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim And to Enjoin Plaintiff From Bringing Further Duplicative Actions Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2019 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Judge Brenda K. Sannes Response to Motion due by 11/18/2019 Reply to Response to Motion due by 11/25/2019. filed by Bloomberg BNA, Bloomberg Industry Group. (Freeman, Scarlett)
October 31, 2019 ***Answer due date updated for Bloomberg BNA answer due 11/1/2019; Bloomberg Industry Group answer due 11/1/2019. (see)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. upon review of this case, it was determined that this case is directly related to case #5:19-cv-1281. In the interest of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby and Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks for all further proceedings. Judge Brenda K. Sannes and US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter no longer assigned to case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 10/31/19. (lmw) (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Defendants Corporate Disclosure Statement served on Jeffrey S. Jackson on 10/29/2019, filed by Bloomberg BNA, Bloomberg Industry Group. (Freeman, Scarlett)
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for General Order #25 (Filing Order), Case Management Plan, Case Assignment/Motion Schedules and Filing Locations, and a Consent Form to Proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge served on Jeffrey S. Jackson on 10/29/2019, filed by Bloomberg BNA, Bloomberg Industry Group. (Freeman, Scarlett)
October 29, 2019 Clerk mailed a copy of the Dkt. No. #3 G.O. 25 Filing Order to pro se plaintiff at P.O. Box 3174, Liverpool, NY 13090 via regular mail on 10/29/2019. (hmr)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bloomberg BNA, Bloomberg Industry Group identifying Other Affiliate Bloomberg-BNA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Bloomberg Inc. for Bloomberg BNA, Bloomberg Industry Group.. (Freeman, Scarlett)
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Defendant's Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet served on Jeffrey S. Jackson on 10/25/2019, filed by Bloomberg BNA, Bloomberg Industry Group. (Freeman, Scarlett)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE HANDBOOK and NOTICE: Clerk mailed a copy of the Notice and Pro Se Handbook to Pro Se Plaintiff on 10/28/2019 and the Plaintiff was directed to read the notice and return a signed copy back to the Court. (pjh)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 11/27/2019 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/20/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT filed in Onondaga County Court by Jeffrey S. Jackson, State Court Case Number SU-2019-009089 filed by Bloomberg BNA and Bloomberg Industry Group. (pjh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Onondaga County Court, case number SU-2019-009089 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4920893) filed by Bloomberg BNA and Bloomberg Industry Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint)(pjh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (pjh). Modified on 10/29/2019 to include Civil Cover Sheet (pjh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. STF Services Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomberg L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomberg Industry Group
Represented By: Scarlett L. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STF Services Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomberg BNA
Represented By: Scarlett L. Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey S. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?