Pattit v. Johnson & Johnson, et al.
Plaintiff: Ronald C. Pattit
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 5:2019cv01540
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: Thomas J McAvoy
2 Judge: Brenda K Sannes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order #193. Opposition period has expired with no objections filed. ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2738 Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. Case to be assigned to the Hon. Freda L. Wolfson, U.S. District Judge. (plp)
January 21, 2020 Case transferred electronically to District of New Jersey for inclusion into MDL-2738 Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Litigation. (plp)
January 21, 2020 Case transferred from New York Northern has been opened in District of New Jersey as case 3:20-cv-00667, filed 01/21/2020. (plp)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF RELATED ACTIONS: filed by John H. Beisner, Esq., on behalf of Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Counsel states this case is related to MDL 2738. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope)(jmb)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brenda K. Sannes for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy no longer assigned to case. Authorized by Senior Judge Thomas J. McAvoy on 1/9/2020. (amt)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Johnson & Johnson on 12/12/2019 by Ronald C. Pattit. (jdp )
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 3/13/2020 at 09:30 AM by telephone conference before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/6/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (jdp )
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4971219) filed by Ronald C. Pattit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jdp )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pattit v. Johnson & Johnson, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald C. Pattit
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?