Edwards v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Edwards
Defendant: DOES 1 to 25 and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv01550
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Referring Judge: David N Hurd
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Michaels on behalf of Stephen Edwards (Michaels, Jonathan)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan Michaels, Esq. for Stephen Edwards. Counsel is hereby advised that as of January 16, 2018, the NYND has converted to NextGen. Due to this conversion, you must now register for Pro Hac Vice access through your PACER account. This is the only notice you will receive concerning this requirement. You will not have access to electronically file in this case until your Pro Hac Vice request has been processed through the PACER system. Step-by-step instructions on how to complete this process are available at http://www.nynd.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions-nextgen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 12/23/2019. (sg)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jonathan A. Michaels Filing fee $100, receipt number ANYNDC-4981109. filed by Stephen Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation Declaration of Sponsor, #2 Proposed Order/Judgment Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission, #3 Exhibit(s) 12-21-19 Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing - USDC-Central District of California, #5 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing - The State Bar of California, #6 Exhibit(s) 12-18-19 Oath on Admission, #7 Exhibit(s) 12-21-19 New Atty E-Filing Registration Form) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Hacker, James)
December 16, 2019 TEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named DOES 1-25 and in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on "DOES" defendants at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against those defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the "DOES 1-25" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.15 and summons will be issued at that time. (sfp, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Admission Requirement as to Party Plaintiff; Attorney Jonathan Michaels, Email address is jmichaels@mlgaplc.com. Phone number is (949)581-6900. Admissions due by 12/30/2019. [Served by reg. mail.](sfp, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/9/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sfp, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FCA US LLC. (sfp, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against DOES 1 to 25, FCA US LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4973820) filed by Stephen Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Edwards
Represented By: James E. Hacker
Represented By: Jonathan Michaels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?